Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1014993 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1014993



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2740
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
18.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.05.2008 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
29.05.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
27.05.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
26.04.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.04.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
22.04.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.04.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.04.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
14.04.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.04.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
11.04.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 4
10.04.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
07.04.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
07.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
06.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
06.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
06.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
06.03.2008 Description Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Description Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Description Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Description Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.02.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 11
07.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.12.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
06.04.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Claims Appeal 2
29.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
29.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
29.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.03.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.03.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.03.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 38
17.11.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 4
08.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
08.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.11.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
08.11.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
02.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
02.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
02.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
02.11.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
31.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
31.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
31.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
31.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.08.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 3
19.08.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.08.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 3
17.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
09.08.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
21.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
21.06.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
21.06.2005 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
21.06.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.06.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2005 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
09.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.05.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.05.2005 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
05.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2005 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 9
31.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Authorisation Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Authorisation Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
16.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
11.03.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Authorisation Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Claims Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Description Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
11.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
11.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
22.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
08.11.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.11.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
29.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
25.10.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.10.2004 Request for documents Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.08.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
28.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.07.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
22.07.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
13.07.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
07.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.07.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
06.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
18.12.2003 Claims Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Claims Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Claims Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Claims Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Description Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Description Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Description Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Description Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
18.12.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 31
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
26.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
26.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
20.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
20.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
14.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 71
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
14.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
14.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
14.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
14.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
13.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
13.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
13.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.03.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.03.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.03.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.02.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
06.02.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.02.2002 Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
24.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.05.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2000 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 4
17.03.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
11.02.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
10.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
19.04.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.03.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.03.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 15