Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008227

EP1008227 - LINEAR/ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRI-TECH, INC.
1500 Meriden Road
Waterbury, CT 06705 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Tri-Tech, Inc.
1500 Meriden Road
Waterbury, CT 06705 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOWALSKI, Keith
101 Jackson Lane
Bethlehem, CT 06751 / US
02 / PALMERO, Albert
106 Mattabeseck Road
Middlebury, CT 06455 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98944563.027.08.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US17801
Priority number, dateUS19970057683P27.08.1997         Original published format: US 57683 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9910965
Date:04.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1008227
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/06, H02K41/00, B25J18/04, B25J18/06, H02K7/106
[2001/12]
Former International [2000/24]H02K7/06, H02K41/00, B25J18/04, B25J18/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/24]
TitleGerman:LINEARE/DREHENDE ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2000/24]
English:LINEAR/ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE[2000/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTROMAGNETIQUE LINEAIRE/ROTATIF[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2000National basic fee paid 
24.03.2000Search fee paid 
24.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
01.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2659066  (HANNING ELEKTRO WERKE) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * column 4, line 3 - line 14; figure 1; claims 1,4,9 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 13 - line 16 * * column 6, line 17 - line 23 *;
 [X]US3407680  (WESTMORELAND JULIUS C) [X] 1-4,6,10 * column 1, line 57 - line 63 * * column 3, line 53 - line 55 * * column 3, line 23 - line 27 * * column 3, line 59 - line 61 * * column 2, line 53 - line 60; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5649451  (RULAND FREDERICK W [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 29 - line 31 * * column 1, line 45 - line 63 * * column 2, line 3 - line 6 * * column 2, line 43 - line 45 * * column 5, line 1 - line 2 * * column 5, line 24 - line 30 *;
 [X]US5100271  (KAMEYAMA FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 23 - line 27; figure 1 * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 *;
 [A]US5044222  (TANAKA MOTOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 8,9 * column 5, line 24 - line 33 *
International search[AP]US5789830  (PORTEGIES HANS [US], et al);
 [X]US5093596  (HAMMER ROBERT [US])