EP1020079 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING MOTION PICTURE CINEMATIC INFORMATION FOR VIEWING IN MOVIE THEATERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guido, Mary M. 1246 Saxoburg Boulevard Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | For all designated states Guido, Margaret A. 1246 Saxoburg Boulevard Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 98944713.1 | 03.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US18325 | Priority number, date | US19970922858 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: US 922858 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912350 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020079 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H04N7/17309 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41415 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/6137 (EP,US);
H04N21/6187 (EP,US);
H04N21/63345 (EP,US);
H04N21/6581 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON KINEMATOGRAFISCHEN DATEN FÜR EINE VORFÜHRUNG IM FILMTHEATER | [2000/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING MOTION PICTURE CINEMATIC INFORMATION FOR VIEWING IN MOVIE THEATERS | [2000/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES CINEMATOGRAPHIQUES EN VUE DE LEUR PROJECTION DANS DES SALLES DE CINEMA | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 23.03.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9706637 (SIP [IT], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 6,10; | [E]EP0884908 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [E] 1,4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9959335 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0721263 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,6,10 * abstract * [A] 1,7,8 | [XY] - MORT R.J. ET AL., "CINENET: High Definition Services via Satellite for Electronic Cinema", HDTV'97 PROCEEDINGS OF 20TH MONTREUX INTERNATIONAL TELEVISION SYMPOSIUM, Montreux, Switzerland, (19970610), pages 1 - 7, XP000978272 [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * paragraph [04.1]; figure 1 * * paragraph [06.2] * [Y] 3,6,10 | International search | [YP]US5696560 (SONGER JIMMIE D [US]); | [Y]US4974252 (OSBORNE JOSEPH A [US]) |