blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1017415

EP1017415 - PRODUCT FOR PROMOTING DURAL OR MENINGEAL TISSUE GROWTH COMPRISING COLLAGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.07.2013
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 21.08.2013  [2013/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Integra Lifesciences Corporation
105 Morgan Lane, P.O. Box 688
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
[2005/42]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Integra Lifesciences I, Corporation
105 Morgan Lane, P.O. Box 688
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAROTAM, Pradeep, K.
309 Bower Boulevard
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3P OL4 / CA
02 / VAN DELLEN, James
276 Manning Road Durban
Glenwood 4001 / ZA
03 / O'FEE, Robert, P.
71 Woodside Lane
New Hope, Pennsylvania 18938 / US
04 / MCKINNEY, George, W., III
33 Old Orchard Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US
05 / ARCHIBALD, Simon, J.
21 Maple Lane
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
06 / O'GRADY, Judith
51 Sandlewood Drive
Marlboro, NJ 07746 / US
 [2001/49]
Former [2000/28]01 / NAROTAM, Pradeep, K.
309 Bower Boulevard
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3P OL4 / CA
02 / VAN DELLEN, James
276 Manning Road Durban
Glenwood 4001 / ZA
03 / O'FEE, Robert, P.
700 Clover Ridge Drive
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
04 / MCKINNEY, George, W., III
33 Old Orchard Road
Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US
05 / ARCHIBALD, Simon, J.
21 Maple Lane
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
06 / O'GRADY, Judith
51 Sandlewood Drive
Marlboro, NJ 07746 / US
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
104 Rue de Richelieu
CS92104
75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2007/18]Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/28]Koch, Gustave, et al
Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date98944836.009.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998US18849
Priority number, dateUS19970059089P16.09.1997         Original published format: US 59089 P
US19970064261P04.11.1997         Original published format: US 64261 P
US1998007065930.04.1998         Original published format: US 70659
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9913902
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017415
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017415
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/39
[2000/28]
CPC:
C08L89/06 (EP); A61K38/39 (EP); A61L27/24 (EP)
C-Set:
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES WACHSTUMS VON DURALEM ODER MENINGEALEM GEWEBE ENTHALTEND KOLLAGEN[2000/28]
English:PRODUCT FOR PROMOTING DURAL OR MENINGEAL TISSUE GROWTH COMPRISING COLLAGEN[2000/28]
French:PRODUIT A BASE DE COLLAGENE FAVORISANT LA CROISSANCE DE TISSU DURAL OU MENINGE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2000National basic fee paid 
14.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2005Fee for grant paid
21.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  27.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
CODMAN & SHURTLEFF INC.
325 Paramount Drive
Rynham, MA 02767 / US
Opponent's representative
Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006  27.07.2006  ADMISSIBLE
CODMAN & SHURTLEFF INC.
325 Paramount Drive
Rynham, MA 02767 / US
Opponent's representative
Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2006/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2006   
CODMAN & SHURTLEFF INC.
325 Paramount Drive
Rynham, MA 02767 / US
Opponent's representative
Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
24.08.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.05.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/34]
Appeal following opposition14.08.2008Appeal received No.  T1582/08
26.11.2008Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
07.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
17.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
CY19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
LU09.09.2006
IE11.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
LU09.09.2006
IE11.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/16]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
IE11.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2006/38]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT19.10.2005
CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
LI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[YD]US4016877  (CRUZ JR MAMERTO M, et al) [YD] 8,41,60 * abstract *;
 [YD]US4066083  (RIES PETER E) [YD] 8,41,60 * abstract *;
 [YD]US4578067  (CRUZ JR MAMERTO M [US]) [YD] 8,41,60 * abstract *;
 [XDY]US5019087  (NICHOLS JOSEPH [US]) [XD] 1-5,9-17,22-40,42-54,56-59,76-79,85-89,94 * abstract * * column 6, lines 35-53 * * column 4, lines 54-61 * * column 9, lines 44-48 * * column 7, lines 44-48 * * column 10, lines 26-41 * [Y] 3-5,7-23,33-41,43-45,47,49-51,53,54,57-60,63,64,66-68,70,71,73-95;
 [XY]  - NAROTAM P K ET AL, "A clinicopathological study of collagen sponge as a dural graft in neurosurgery.", JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, (1995 MAR) 82 (3) 406-12. JOURNAL CODE: JD3. ISSN: 0022-3085., United States, XP002087132 [X] 1,2,6,24-32,41,42,46,48,52,55,56,60-62,65,69,72 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,7-23,33-40,43-45,47,49-51,53,54,57-59,63,64,66-68,70,71,73-95
 [XY]  - NAROTAM P K ET AL, "Experimental evaluation of collagen sponge as a dural graft.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, (1993) 7 (6) 635-41. JOURNAL CODE: AHZ. ISSN: 0268-8697., ENGLAND: United Kingdom, XP002087133 [X] 1,2,6,10-18,24-32,39,41-44,46,48,52,55,57,58,60-62,65,69,72-74,77-80 * abstract * * page 635, column R, line 11 - page 636, column L, line 4 * [Y] 81-95,3-5,7-9,19-23,33-38,40,45,47,49-51,53,54,59,63,64,66-68,70,71,75,76
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.