Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1012827

EP1012827 - SPEECH RECOGNITION SYSTEM FOR RECOGNIZING CONTINUOUS AND ISOLATED SPEECH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Xuedong, D.
20020 N.E. 121st Street
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
02 / ALLEVA, Fileno, A.
16516 N.E. 48th Street
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
03 / JIANG, Li
15360 N.E. 66th Court
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / HWANG, Mei-Yuh
14802 N.E. 68th Street
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98944874.116.09.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US19346
Priority number, dateUS1997093462219.09.1997         Original published format: US 934622
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9916052
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1012827
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1012827
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:G10L5/06, G10L15/06
[2005/17]
Former International [2000/26]G10L5/06
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:SPRACHERKENNUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE ERKENNUNG VON KONTINUIERLICHER UND ISOLIERTER SPRACHE[2000/26]
English:SPEECH RECOGNITION SYSTEM FOR RECOGNIZING CONTINUOUS AND ISOLATED SPEECH[2000/26]
French:SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE SERVANT A RECONNAITRE UNE EXPRESSION VOCALE CONTINUE ET ISOLEE[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2000National basic fee paid 
17.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
06.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2005Fee for grant paid
19.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05077070.0  / EP1610301
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0202534  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 8 * * idem * [Y] 3-5,9-15,23;
 [Y]US5526463  (GILLICK LAURENCE S ET AL) [Y] 4,5 * column 9, line 53 - line 57 *;
 [X]US4783808  (DODDINGTON GEORGE R ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,8 * column 2, line 15 - line 41 *;
 [A]US5144672  (KURIKI SHOJI) [A] 7 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - HWANG M -Y ET AL, "PREDICTING UNSEEN TRIPHONES WITH SENONES", SPEECH PROCESSING, MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930427), vol. 2, pages II-311 - 314, XP000427788 [Y] 3,11-15,23 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319299
 [Y]  - LIPPMANN R P ET AL, "Multi-style training for robust isolated-word speech recognition", PROCEEDINGS: ICASSP 87. 1987 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.87CH2396-0), DALLAS, TX, USA, 6-9 APRIL 1987, 1987, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 705 - 708 vol.2, XP002085099 [Y] 9,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - RABINER L R, "A TUTORIAL ON HIDDEN MARKOV MODELS AND SELECTED APPLICATIONS IN SPEECH RECOGNITION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (19890201), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 257 - 285, XP000099251 [A] 16-22 * paragraph [VII.D] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.18626