Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000091

EP1000091 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYETHYLENE WITH A TITANIUM AMIDE CATALYST AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Buna Sow Leuna Olefinverbund GmbH
06258 Schkopau / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHELLENBERG, Jürgen
Wilhelm-v.-Klewitz-Strasse 7
D-06132 Halle / DE
02 / KERRINNES, Heinz-Jürgen
Prager Strasse 19
D-06128 Halle / DE
03 / FRITZSCHE, Gerd
Curiestrasse, 50
D-06217 Merseburg / DE
04 / LOHSE, Gerd
Ludwigshafenstrasse 18
D-06258 Schkopau / DE
[2000/20]
Application number, filing date98944983.010.07.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998DE01939
Priority number, dateDE199713296331.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19732963
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9906447
Date:11.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000091
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000091
Date:03.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/02, C08F10/00
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLEN MIT EINEM TITANAMID-KATALYSATOR UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/20]
English:METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYETHYLENE WITH A TITANIUM AMIDE CATALYST AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2000/20]
French:PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DU POLYETHYLENE AVEC UN CATALYSEUR A L'AMIDE DE TITANE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DUDIT CATALYSEUR[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2000National basic fee paid 
16.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
03.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2001Fee for grant paid
11.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.04.2002
FR03.04.2002
GB03.04.2002
IT03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
AT10.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FI03.04.2002
FR03.04.2002
GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
AT10.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
Former [2004/40]FI03.04.2002
GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
AT10.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2004/04]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
AT10.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2004/03]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
AT10.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2003/51]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2003/47]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2003/39]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
Former [2003/09]GB03.04.2002
NL03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
Former [2003/01]GB03.04.2002
SE03.07.2002
Former [2002/42]SE03.07.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DD282013  (BUNA CHEM WERKE VEB [DD]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0320169  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1 * examples 1-3 *