Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995142

EP0995142 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MICROSCOPES AND APPARATUS CONNECTED THERETO BY DIRECTION OF VIEW ANALYSIS USING AN APPARATUS FOR MEASURING DIRECTION OF VIEW AND A SUITABLE EYEPIECE ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensomotoric Instruments GmbH
Warthestrasse 21
14513 Teltow / DE
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / STROMMER, Kevin
0000000
deceased / DE
02 / SCHÖNENBERGER, Klaus
Apartment 62, 5665 Charlotte Way
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
03 / RINK, Klaus
Avenue des Roses 88
CH-1009 Pully / CH
04 / DELACREETAZ, Guy
Chemin Neuf 5
CH-1028 Preverenges / CH
05 / TEIWES, Winfried
Weddingenweg 67
D-12205 Berlin / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Schöniger, Franz-Josef , et al
Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]Schöniger, Franz-Josef , et al
Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
Former [2003/14](deleted)
...
Former [2000/17]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Friedlander Strasse 37
12489 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98945011.913.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998DE02010
Priority number, dateDE199713130113.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19731301
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9903009
Date:21.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995142
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/20
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN VON MIKROSKOPEN UND ANGEKOPPELTEN GERÄTEN MITTELS BLICKRICHTUNGSANALYSE, BLICKRICHTUNGSMESSGERÄT UND OKULARAUFSATZ HIERFÜR[2000/17]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MICROSCOPES AND APPARATUS CONNECTED THERETO BY DIRECTION OF VIEW ANALYSIS USING AN APPARATUS FOR MEASURING DIRECTION OF VIEW AND A SUITABLE EYEPIECE ATTACHMENT[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE MICROSCOPES ET D'APPAREILS QUI Y SONT ACCOUPLES, PAR ANALYSE DU SENS DE VISION, A L'AIDE D'UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DU SENS DE VISION, ET PIECE OCULAIRE RAPPORTEE APPROPRIEE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
02.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/32]
05.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/32]
Request for further processing for:
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2001
31.07.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9613743  (LEICA AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1,9,12 * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 2; figure 1 *;
 [DA]GB2272124  (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1,9,12 * page 11, line 11 - page 13, line 27; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4973149  (HUTCHINSON THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1,9,12 * column 10, line 23 - line 61; figure 3 *