EP1000523 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADAPTING THE SETTING UP OF CONNECTIONS BY SWITCHING BETWEEN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK COMPONENTS WITH TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEXING VIA AN ATM COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAAS, Wolfgang Karwendelstrasse 2 D-82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
HÜNLICH, Klaus Birkenstrasse 4 D-85467 Neuching / DE | 03 /
PETRI, Bernhard Rohrauerstrasse 1 D-81477 München / DE | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 98945026.7 | 22.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998DE02059 | Priority number, date | DE1997132676 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732676 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907179 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000523 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000523 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
H04L49/309 (EP);
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04L2012/563 (EP);
H04L2012/5665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANPASSUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM VERMITTELN VON WÄHLVERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN ZEITMULTIPLEXORIENTIERTEN KOMPONENTEN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES ÜBER EIN ATM-KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2000/20] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADAPTING THE SETTING UP OF CONNECTIONS BY SWITCHING BETWEEN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK COMPONENTS WITH TIME DIVISION MULTIPLEXING VIA AN ATM COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2000/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ADAPTATION POUR ETABLIR DES CONNEXIONS PAR COMMUTATION ENTRE DES COMPOSANTS A MULTIPLEXAGE DANS LE TEMPS D'UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION ATM | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 30.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.07.2008 | [2010/06] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5463621 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 29; figure 4 *; | [A]US5490141 (LAI FUYUNG [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,8 * column 2, line 19 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0603915 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2297881 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09107359 | [A] - SHELEF N, "SVC SIGNALING: CALLING ALL NODES ATM SWITCHED VIRTUAL CIRCUITS REQUIRE SOME COMPLEX PROCEDURES TO ESTABLISH CONNECTIONS BETWEEN END-STATIONS", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, (19950601), vol. 24, no. 8, page 123/124, 126, 128, 130, XP000506589 [A] 1-8 * Absatz "Applied Advantage" * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, & JP09107359 A 19970422 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |