Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001961

EP1001961 - SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROPYRANE DERIVATIVES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/21]SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROPYRANE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, THEIR USE AS MEDICINE OR DIAGNOSTIC AGENT, AS WELL AS MEDICINE CONTAINING SAME
[2004/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Wolfgang
Johannesallee 14
D-65929 Frankfurtam Main / DE
02 / HENKE, Stephan
Wingertstrasse 2c
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / KUNZ, Horst
Gemeindehohl 50
D-55127 Mainz / DE
04 / KALLUS, Christopher
J.J. Becherweg 18 - 20
D-55099 Mainz / DE
05 / OBATZ, Till
J.J. Becherweg 18 - 20
D-55099 Mainz / DE
06 / WUNBERG, Tobias
J.J. Becherweg 18 - 20
D-55099 Mainz / DE
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date98945178.607.08.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998EP05025
Priority number, dateDE199713439208.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734392
DE199812081509.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19820815
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9907718
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001961
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001961
Date:26.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07H1/00
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE TETRAHYDROPYRANDERIVATE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2004/31]
English:SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROPYRANE DERIVATIVES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2004/31]
French:DERIVES SUBSTITUES DU TETRAHYDROPYRANE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2004/31]
Former [2000/21]SUBSTITUIERTE TETRAHYDROPYRANDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL ODER DIAGNOSTIKUM SOWIE SIE ENTHALTENDES ARZNEIMITTEL
Former [2000/21]SUBSTITUTED TETRAHYDROPYRANE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, THEIR USE AS MEDICINE OR DIAGNOSTIC AGENT, AS WELL AS MEDICINE CONTAINING SAME
Former [2000/21]DERIVES SUBSTITUES DU TETRAHYDROPYRANE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS OU AGENTS DIAGNOSTIQUES, ET MEDICAMENTS LES CONTENANT
Entry into regional phase08.03.2000National basic fee paid 
08.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
05.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2004Fee for grant paid
17.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Request for further processing for:04.06.2003Request for further processing filed
04.06.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0319253  (CHEMBIOMED LTD [CA]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 6, line 44 - page 7, line 24 *;
 [X]WO9518814  (INNOVATIONS FOUNDATION [CA]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 31 *;
 [X]US5220008  (SABESAN SUBRAMANIAM [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9419360  (UNIV PRINCETON [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * figures 5,6 *;
 [X]WO9503315  (OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 21 *;
 [X]WO9720855  (GENZYME LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9745436  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE2630596  (CANADIAN PATENTS DEV) [X] 9 * page 10 - page 11; examples 1-4,12,13; claims 1,39 *;
 [X]EP0233837  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 9 * examples 1,3,4,9,12 *;
 [X]DE2816340  (LEMIEUX) [X] 9 * example 24 *;
 [X]EP0063373  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 9 * Seite 8,10,17 *;
 [X]WO9205444  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 9 * Verbindung 7; page 10 *;
 [X]WO9728173  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 9 * page 20 *;
 [X]WO9222564  (ALBERTA RES COUNCIL [CA]) [X] 9 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE3220427  (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [X] 9 * example 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9722346  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 12,13 * page 11 - page 13 *;
 [X]WO9623479  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 12,13 * page 3 - page 7 *;
 [X]DE2212014  (DEUTSCHE AKADEMIE DER WISSENSCHAFTEN) [X] 12,13 * s. Figur 1,2,5-8,10,11; page 6, column 12 *;
 [X]US5455240  (TUOMANEN ELAINE I [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * column 4, lines 24-28 *;
 [X]WO9511686  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [X] 12,13 * page 18; claims 21-23,27,28 *;
 [X]WO9311776  (BIOMEMBRANE INST [US]) [X] 12,13 * claims 1-15 *;
 [X]JPH0748264  ;
 [X]JPH0517359  ;
 [A]US5444050  (KOGAN TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 12,13
 [X]  - TAKEO ET AL., "Synthesis of 8-methoxycarbonyloctyl-beta-glycosides", J. CARBOHYDR. CHEM., (1994), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 1159 - 77, XP002091924 [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *
 [X]  - POCHET, S. ET AL., "Alkylglycoside carbonates of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine", TETRAHEDR. LETT., (1990), vol. 31, no. 42, pages 6021 - 4, XP002091925 [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98018-3
 [X]  - BEYER, LEHRBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, (1981), pages 411 - 3, XP002091926 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WIJNBERGEN, F. ET AL., "Synthesis of some methyl 6-O-alkyl-alpha-D-glycopyranosides", J. CARBOHYDR. RES., (1996), vol. 280, pages 151 - 6, XP004018842 [X] 1-8,10,11 * siehe Verbindung (4), Seite 152 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(95)00306-1
 [X]  - VALENTIJN A. ET AL, "Solid-phase synthesis of lysine-based cluster galactosides with high affinity for the asialoglycoprotein receptor", TETRAHEDRON, (1997), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 759 - 770, XP002103084 [X] 9 * 'Scheme 1'; page 761 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(96)01018-6
 [X]  - BUNDESVERBAND DER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN INDUSTRIE, ROTE LISTE, (1995), pages 51107 - 51115, XP002103085 [X] 12,13 * page 51107 - page 51114 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 05, [X] 12,13 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930604), vol. 017, no. 291, Database accession no. (C - 1067), [X] 12,13 * abstract *