blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1003400

EP1003400 - A METHOD OF ENDROUNDING LOOSE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.B. BOUCHERIE, N.V.
Stuivenbergstraat 106
8870 Izegem / BE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUCHERIE, Bart, Gerard
Ambachtenstraat 84
B-8870 Izegem / BE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys.
Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date98945232.112.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998EP05130
Priority number, dateGB1997001711212.08.1997         Original published format: GB 9717112
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9907255
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003400
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003400
Date:03.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:A46D9/02
[2000/22]
CPC:
A46D9/02 (EP,KR,US); B29C67/0044 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesRO15.02.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ABRUNDEN DER ENDEN VON LOSEN FASERN[2000/22]
English:A METHOD OF ENDROUNDING LOOSE FIBRES[2000/22]
French:PROCEDE D'ARRONDISSAGE D'EXTREMITES DE FIBRES LACHES[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase15.02.2000National basic fee paid 
15.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
27.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2002Fee for grant paid
08.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.2002
FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
CY31.08.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
[2005/21]
Former [2004/10]AT03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
CY31.08.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/46]AT03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/22]GR03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/20]GR03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE03.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2554777  (ROGER DANGIN) [X] 1-3 * column W * [Y] 8;
 [A]US2587792  (VON SIVERS CARL HENRIC);
 [AD]EP0346646  (SCHLERF CORONET WERKE [DE]);
 [A]US5007686  (KLEIN ROLF M [DE], et al);
 [YD]DE29614118U  (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [YD] 8 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 21; figure - *
by applicantEP0346646
 DE29614118U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.