Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977547

EP0977547 - OXIDISING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DE LA METTRIE, Roland
6, boulevard d'Angleterre
F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR
02 / COTTERET, Jean
13, rue du Pré Rousselin
F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR
03 / DE LABBEY, Arnaud
9, rue Charles Dordain
F-93600 Aulnay sous Bois / FR
04 / MAUBRU, Mireille
7, avenue d'Eprémesnil
F-78400 Chatou / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Former [2000/06]Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98945347.722.09.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998FR02023
Priority number, dateFR1997001236003.10.1997         Original published format: FR 9712360
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917725
Date:15.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977547
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977547
Date:12.11.2003
Language:FR
[2003/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/13, A61K7/06, A61K7/09, A61K7/135
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:OXIDATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUM FÄRBEN, ZUR DAUERHAFTEN VERFORMUNG UND ZUM ENTFÄRBEN DER HAAREN[2000/06]
English:OXIDISING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES[2000/06]
French:COMPOSITION OXYDANTE ET UTILISATIONS POUR LA TEINTURE, POUR LA DEFORMATION PERMANENTE OU POUR LA DECOLORATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase05.07.1999National basic fee paid 
05.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
13.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2003Fee for grant paid
21.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
NL12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
PT12.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2004/41]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
NL12.11.2003
DK12.02.2004
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/40]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
IE12.11.2003
NL12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/33]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
NL12.11.2003
GR12.02.2004
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT12.11.2003
FI12.11.2003
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI12.11.2003
SE12.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE12.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0310675  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [DA] 1-7,17-22,24-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0716846  (YAMAHATSU SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-7,17-22,24-28 * example - *;
 [A]DE19547991  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-22,24-28,31,32 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9400100  (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-7,24-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0795313  (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-22,24-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0548620  (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-22,24-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0548621  (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,24-26,31 * the whole document *;
 [DX]FR2586913  (OREAL [FR]) [DX] 30 * the whole document *;
 [T]EP0827739  (OREAL [FR]) [T] 1-32 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0216479