Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018900

EP1018900 - SUCTION BAND FOR A CIGARETTE MAKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stewart Fibre Control Limited
West Nevay, Newtyle Blairgowrie
Perthshire PH12 8SJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Stewart Fibre Control Limited
West Nevay, Newtyle
Blairgowrie, Perthshire PH12 8SJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / STEWART, David, Bruce
The Coach House, Nevay Park,Newtyle
Blairgowrie, Perthshire PH12 8SH / GB
02 / DAWSON, John
Frant Lodge, 8 Watford Road
Crick, Northants NN6 7TT / GB
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet , et al
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Potter, Vanessa J. , et al
Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct, Balm Green
Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB
Application number, filing date98945388.123.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998GB02827
Priority number, dateGB1997002011623.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9720116
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915037
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018900
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018900
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/18, B29C65/74
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VAKUUMBAND FÜR ZIGARETTENMASCHINEN[2000/29]
English:SUCTION BAND FOR A CIGARETTE MAKING MACHINE[2000/29]
French:BANDE D'ASPIRATION POUR UNE MACHINE A FABRIQUER DES CIGARETTES[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2000National basic fee paid 
17.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
25.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2000Fee for grant paid
20.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
CY02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
IT02.05.2001
DK02.08.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
GR03.08.2001
LU23.09.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
[2008/16]
Former [2004/51]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
CY02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
DK02.08.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
GR03.08.2001
LU23.09.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
Former [2004/39]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
CY02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
DK02.08.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
LU23.09.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
Former [2004/04]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
CY02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
DK02.08.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
Former [2003/46]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
DK02.08.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
Former [2002/48]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
MC23.09.2001
IE24.09.2001
Former [2002/43]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
MC23.09.2001
Former [2002/27]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
PT02.08.2001
SE02.08.2001
Former [2002/15]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
FI02.05.2001
SE02.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT02.05.2001
BE02.05.2001
SE02.08.2001
Former [2002/12]BE02.05.2001
SE02.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE02.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9730604  (SCAPA GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 12, line 14 - line 21; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US4758297  (CALLIGARICH ELIO [IT]) [A] 1,9,11 * column W *;
 [A]US5066531  (LEGG WARREN F [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * column W *
by applicantGB2023401
 GB2087213