Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979651

EP0979651 - PORTAL HYPERTENSION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sucampo AG
Graben 5
6300 Zug / CH
[2007/18]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
R-Tech Ueno, Ltd.
4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UENO, Ryuji
9476, Turnberry Drive
Potimac, Montgomery MD 20854 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date98945529.030.09.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998JP04398
Priority number, dateJP1997027853913.10.1997         Original published format: JP 27853997
[2000/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918968
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979651
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/557
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:INHIBITOR DES HOCHBLUTDRUCKS[2000/07]
English:PORTAL HYPERTENSION INHIBITOR[2000/07]
French:INHIBITEUR DE L'HYPERTENSION PORTALE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase15.06.1999Translation filed 
16.06.1999National basic fee paid 
16.06.1999Search fee paid 
16.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
13.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2006Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2008/40]
26.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.03.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/40]
Appeal following examination10.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1652/06
05.10.2006Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.03.2008Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP08004429.0   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 14.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH0848665  ;
 [A]JPH0232021