Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0979651 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0979651



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 578
28.01.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.08.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
28.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.04.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 32
11.04.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 32
20.03.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
04.03.2008 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
07.02.2008 Claims Appeal 2
07.02.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.12.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.12.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.02.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
05.02.2007 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 4
07.11.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.10.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.10.2006 Claims Appeal 2
05.10.2006 Claims Appeal 2
05.10.2006 Claims Appeal 2
05.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
05.10.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
11.07.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.07.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
26.05.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 10
26.05.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.05.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.04.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure Search / examination 2
18.04.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.04.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
27.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure Search / examination 3
27.03.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.01.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.12.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Description Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Description Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.04.2005 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.04.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
13.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
13.04.2005 Description Search / examination 2
13.04.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.02.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2004 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.10.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.10.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.10.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.09.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
17.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
17.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
17.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
17.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
17.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
15.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 43
14.09.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 42
02.09.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.08.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.08.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Description Search / examination 3
29.10.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.10.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
13.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
07.01.2003 Description Search / examination 2
07.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
27.11.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
25.02.2002 Description Search / examination 9
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
25.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 29
08.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.04.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.08.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.08.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 13
17.06.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
15.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 6
15.06.1999 Description Search / examination 1
15.06.1999 Description Search / examination 22
15.06.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
15.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
24.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 12
07.05.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.04.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.04.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36