Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011689

EP1011689 - USE OF 9a-AZALIDES AS VETERINARY ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/26]9a-AZALIDES AS VETERINARY ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS
[2006/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merial Ltd.
3239 Satellite Blvd.
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
[2006/11]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
MERCK & CO., INC.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KROPP, Helmut
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / FARRINGTON, Daniel, O.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / CLARK, Jeffrey, N.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
04 / RATCLIFFE, Ronald, W.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
05 / WILKENING, Robert, D.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
 [2007/18]
Former [2000/26]01 / KRO00, Helmut
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / FARRINGTON, Daniel, O.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / CLARK, Jeffrey, N.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
04 / RATCLIFFE, Ronald, W.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
05 / WILKENING, Robert, D.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
Representative(s)Clyde-Watson, Zöe , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Clyde-Watson, Zöe , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2004/27]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2000/26]Thompson, John Dr. , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date98945912.804.09.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US18579
Priority number, dateUS19970058330P10.09.1997         Original published format: US 58330 P
GB1998000642025.03.1998         Original published format: GB 9806420
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912552
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011689
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011689
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/05]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1011689
Date:09.05.2007
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, A61P31/04
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/26]A61K31/70
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON 9A-AZALIDEN ALS ANTIMIKROBIELLE MITTEL FÜR TIERE[2006/24]
English:USE OF 9a-AZALIDES AS VETERINARY ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS[2006/24]
French:UTILISATION DE 9a-AZALIDES COMME AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS VETERINAIRES[2006/24]
Former [2000/26]9A-AZALIDE ALS TIERISCHE ANTIMIKROBIELLE MITTEL
Former [2000/26]9a-AZALIDES AS VETERINARY ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS
Former [2000/26]9a-AZALIDES UTILISES COMME AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS VETERINAIRES
Entry into regional phase10.04.2000National basic fee paid 
10.04.2000Search fee paid 
10.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2004Observations by third parties
10.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2006
02.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.05.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2006Fee for grant paid
06.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP06024015.7   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 21.11.2006
EP06026451.2   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 22.01.2007
EP07001854.4  / EP1779853
Opposition(s)01.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/02]
Request for further processing for:11.05.2004Request for further processing filed
11.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.05.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9415617  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * page 1, line 1 - line 33 * * claims 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [XA]US5332807  (WADDELL SHERMAN T [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 36 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [E]WO9856801  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [E] 1-5 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 24 * * page 5, line 11 - line 18 *;
 [E]EP0992509  (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [E] 1-5 * page 35; example 2 * * page 25; figure 4 * * page 19; figure 1 *;
 [E]WO9856802  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [E] 1-5 * claims 1,22,23 *
International search[Y]US4328334  (KOBREHEL GABRIJELA, et al)
ExaminationUS4526889
    - MCFARLAND ET AL., "Repromicin Derivatives with Potent Antibacterial Activity against Pasteurella multocida", J. MED. CHEM., (19970314), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1021/jm960435q, pages 1041 - 1045, XP002990644

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960435q
    - SATOSHI OMURA, Macrolide Antibiotics - Chemistry, Biology, and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.,
    - DJOKIC, S. ET AL., "Erythromycin Series. XII. Antibacterial in vitro evaluation of 10-dihydro-10-deoxo-11-azaerythromycin A: Synthesis and structure-activity relationship of its acyl derivatives", J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1987), vol. XL, no. 7, pages 1006 - 1015, XP000654487
otherUS4526889
    - MCFARLAND J.W. ET AL., "Repromicin derivatives with potent antibacterial activity against Pasteurella multocida", J MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 1041 - 1045, XP002990644

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960435q
    - DJOKIC S. ET AL., "Erythromycin Series. XII. Antibacterial in vitro evaluation of 10-dihydro-10-deoxo-11-azaerythromycin A: Synthesis and structure-activity relationship of its acyl derivatives", J OF ANTIBIOTICS, (198707), vol. 40, no. 7, pages 1006 - 1015, XP000654487
    - "Macrolides in veterinary practice (chapter 8)", OMURA S., Macrolide antibiotics - chemistry, biology and practice, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., pages 301 - 347, ISBN 0-12-526450-X, XP002990645
    - PRESCOTT J.F., BAGGOTT J.D., Antimicrobial therapy in veterinary medicine, US, IOWA STATE UNIVERSITY PRESS, page 6 PAGES, ISBN 0-8138-0889-8, XP002990646
    - ROSS P. COWART, An outline of Swine diseases, IOWA STATE UNIVERSITY PRESS, pages 64 - 66, XP002990647