EP1013127 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHANGING FORWARD TRAFFIC CHANNEL POWER ALLOCATION DURING SOFT HANDOFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2006/09] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945959.9 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US18712 | Priority number, date | US19970925518 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: US 925518 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913675 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013127 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013127 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/40 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H04W72/0473 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H04B17/318 (KR);
H04W36/18 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ÄNDERN DER ABWÄRTSSPRACHKANALSLEISTUNGSZUTEILUNG WÄHREND EINES SANFTEN WEITERREICHENS | [2000/26] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CHANGING FORWARD TRAFFIC CHANNEL POWER ALLOCATION DURING SOFT HANDOFF | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CHANGEMENT DE L'AFFECTATION DE PUISSANCE DE CANAUX DE TRAFIC VERS L'AVANT PENDANT UN TRANSFERT SANS COUPURE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0566551 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 7 *; | [DA]US5267261 (BLAKENEY II ROBERT D [US], et al) [DA] 1,28 * abstract * * column 9, line 3 - line 27 ** column 28, line 3 - line 46 *; | [PX]US5771451 (TAKAI KENICHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 23 * |