Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016270

EP1016270 - PERIPHERAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THIS DEVICE VIA A DIGITAL BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10333 North Meridian Street
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St
Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STAHL, Thomas, Anthony
7003 Stewart Court
Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US
02 / RHOADS, Steven, Charles
140 Parkview Road
Carmel, IN 46032 / US
03 / DERRENBERGER, Mike, Arthur
11721 River Ridge Drive
Fishers, IN 46038 / US
04 / IZZAT, Izzat, Hekmat
2249-6 East 151 Street
Carmel, IN 46033 / US
05 / KURUCAY, Saban
Apartment 20 302 West North Street
Waukesha, WI 53188 / US
06 / CHATTERJEE, Amit, Kumar
Apartment 301 600 Bulfinch Drive
Andover, MA 01801 / US
07 / NAGPAL, Sanjeen
Apartment 305 4930 Meredith Way
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Kohrs, Martin , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2000/27]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98946107.418.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US19483
Priority number, dateUS1997005950718.09.1997         Original published format: US 59507
US1997006678225.11.1997         Original published format: US 66782
US1998007134114.01.1998         Original published format: US 71341
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914945
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016270
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016270
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/44
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/27]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES PERIPHERIEGERÄT UND -SYSTEM ZUM STEUERN DIESES GERÄTES ÜBER EINEN DIGITALEN BUS[2000/27]
English:PERIPHERAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THIS DEVICE VIA A DIGITAL BUS[2000/27]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE PERIPHERIQUE ET SYSTEME SERVANT A COMMANDER CE DISPOSITIF PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN BUS NUMERIQUE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2000National basic fee paid 
17.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
15.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2003Fee for grant paid
29.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Request for further processing for:24.08.2001Request for further processing filed
24.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.09.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5608730  (OSAKABE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column 10, line 4 - column 20, line 5 *;
 [X]US5617330  (STIRLING ANDREW J [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column W *;
 [X]US5499018  (WELMER HARM J [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column W *;
 [X]US5617571  (TANAKA SHIGEO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 4 *;
 [PA]WO9749057  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1-12 * column W *;
 [PX]EP0849884  (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * column W *;
 [E]EP0873009  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]US5635979  (KOSTRESKI BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *