Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999963

EP0999963 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A POWER BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
07.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JAKOBI, Ralf
Dresdener Strasse 21
D-65439 Flörsheim / DE
02 / WAGNER, Wilfried
Neckarstrasse 7
D-35625 Hüttenberg / DE
03 / FALLER, Jürgen
Lindenweg 11
D-63796 Kahl / DE
[2000/20]
Application number, filing date98946276.704.08.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998EP04856
Priority number, dateDE199713429008.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734290
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907590
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999963
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999963
Date:02.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/567
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/20]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKERS[2000/20]
English:DEVICE FOR FIXING A POWER BRAKE[2000/20]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN FREIN ASSISTE[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2000National basic fee paid 
08.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
18.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2002Fee for grant paid
05.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.05.2002
[2003/17]
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3203495  (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4567728  (OHMI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line L; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0371831  (BENDIX FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE3803958  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *