EP1007221 - A DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. Erich Pfeiffer GmbH Öschlestrasse 124-126 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖRNER, Joachim Riedweg 23 D-88690 Uhldingen-Mühlhofen / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98946433.4 | 26.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998EP05427 | Priority number, date | DE1997136999 | 26.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736999 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910106 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007221 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B05B11/0005 (EP);
B05B11/1026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | AUSTRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR MEDIEN | [2000/24] | English: | A DEVICE FOR DISCHARGING MEDIA | [2000/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION POUR PRODUITS | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 22.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0427534 ; | [XA]EP0297741 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 17,19 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 - line 52; claims 1-8 * [A] 1-16,18,20; | [X]DE4017153 (ENICHEM ANIC SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,7,9-11,17-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9100826 (YHTYNEET PAPERITEHTAAT OY [FI]) [X] 1,17,19,20 * claims 5,6 *; | [A]EP0530785 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5444103 (TABATA YONEHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column A ** column 1, line 34 - line 41 *; | [PX]EP0791397 (CAIDEIL M P TEORANTA [IE]) [PX] 1-3,6-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 23 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920508), vol. 16, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 1245), & JP04027534 A 00000000 (YOSHINO) [X] 17-20 * abstract * |