Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017718

EP1017718 - NOVEL GENE DEFECTIVE IN APECED AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIT Biotech Oy
Biokatu 8
33520 Tampere / FI
[2008/41]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Finnish Immunotechnology Ltd.
Lenkkeilijänkatu 8
33520 Tampere / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KROHN, Kai
Iltarusko Salmentaantie 751
FIN-36450 Salmentaka / FI
02 / HEINO, Maarit
Kaskitie 6 I 94
33540 Tampere / FI
03 / PETERSON, Pärt
Kaskitie 13 F 61
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
04 / SCOTT, Hamish
43, rue des Bains
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
05 / ANTONARAKIS, Stylianos
28, boulevard des Philosophes
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
06 / LALIOTI, Maria
Division of Medical Genetics University of Medical School
Cantonal Hospital of Geneva Geneva / CH
07 / SHIMIZU, Nobuyoshi
4-1-W2103 Yukarigaoka
Sakura Chiba 285 / JP
08 / KUDOH, Jun
6-14-8-803 Honkomagome
Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP
 [2008/09]
Former [2000/38]01 / KROHN, Kai
Iltarusko Salmentaantie 751
FIN-36450 Salmentaka / FI
02 / HEINO, Maarit
Kaskitie 6 T 94
33540 Tampere / FI
03 / PETERSON, Pärt
Kaskitie 13 F 61
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
04 / SCOTT, Hamish
43, rue des Bains
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
05 / ANTONARAKIS, Stylianos
28, boulevard des Philosophes
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
06 / LALIOTI, Maria
Division of Medical Genetics University of Medical
Cantonal Hospital of Geneva Geneva / CH
07 / SHIMIZU, Nobuyoshi
4-1-W2103 Yukarigaoka
Sakura Chiba 285 / JP
08 / KUDOH, Jun
6-14-8-803 Honkomagome
Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP
Former [2000/28]01 / KROHN, Kai
Iltarusko Salmentaantie 751
FIN-36450 Salmentaka / FI
02 / HEINO, Maarit
Mäkipäänkatu 27-29 C 74
FIN-33500 Tampere / FI
03 / PETERSON, Pärt
Kaskitie 13 F 61
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
04 / SCOTT, Hamish
43, rue des Bains
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
05 / ANTONARAKIS, Stylianos
28, boulevard des Philosophes
CH-1205 Geneva / CH
06 / LALIOTI, Maria
Division of Medical Genetics University of Medical
Cantonal Hospital of Geneva Geneva / CH
07 / SHIMIZU, Nobuyoshi
4-1-W2103 Yukarigaoka
Sakura Chiba 285 / JP
08 / KUDOH, Jun
6-14-8-803 Honkomagome
Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP
Representative(s)Lax, Monica Ingeborg , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]Lax, Monica Ingeborg , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/28]Halmepuro, Liisa , et al
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
FIN-00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98946476.323.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998FI00749
Priority number, dateFI1997000376223.09.1997         Original published format: FI 973762
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915559
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017718
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017718
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, A61K38/17
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:NEUES GEN, WELCHES BEI DER KRANKHEIT APECED DEFEKT IST, UND DESSEN VERWENDUNGEN[2000/28]
English:NOVEL GENE DEFECTIVE IN APECED AND ITS USE[2000/28]
French:NOUVEAU GENE DEFECTUEUX DANS APECED ET SES UTILISATIONS[2007/07]
Former [2000/28]NOUVEAU GENE SANS APECED ET SES UTILISATIONS
Entry into regional phase31.03.2000National basic fee paid 
31.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
28.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
28.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2008Fee for grant paid
26.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
20.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
IE23.09.2008
LU23.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
SE09.10.2008
GR10.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
CY09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
IE23.09.2008
LU23.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
SE09.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2010/28]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
IE23.09.2008
LU23.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
SE09.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2010/19]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
IE23.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
SE09.10.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2010/06]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
IE23.09.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/20]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
MC30.09.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT09.07.2008
BE09.07.2008
DK09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT09.07.2008
NL09.07.2008
PT09.12.2008
Former [2009/12]NL09.07.2008
PT09.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[XP]  - NATURE GENETICS, Volume 17, December 1997, THE FINNISH-GERMAN APECED CONSORTIUM, "An Autoimmune Disease, APECED, Caused by Mutations in a Novel Gene Featuring Two OHD-Type Zinc-Finger Domains", pages 399-403.,
 [A]  - AM. J. HUM. GENET., Volume 59, 1996, P. BJORSES et al., "Genetic Homogeneity of Autoimmune Polyglandular Disease Type I", pages 879-886.,
 [A]  - GENOME RESEARCH, Volume 7, August 1997, JOHANNA AALTONEN et al., "High-Resolution Physical and Transcriptional Mapping of the Autoimmune Polyendocrinopathy-Candidiasis-Ectodermal Dystrophy Locus on Chromosome 21q22.3 by FISH", pages 820-829.,