Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019264

EP1019264 - Signal Transmitting Device between the Control System of a Motor Vehicle and the Safety Equipment of a Removable Seat of that Vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/29]UI
[2003/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Renault s.a.s.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
RENAULT
34 Quai du Point du Jour
92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FROC, Laurent
4, avenue du Saut du Loup
F-78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
02 / LAPORTE, Alain
2, rue Fernand Léger
F-78280 Guyancourt / FR
03 / SOUVILLE, Philippe
15, boulevard Aristide Briand
F-93100 Montreuil / FR
[2000/29]
Application number, filing date98946548.902.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998FR02108
Priority number, dateFR1997001227502.10.1997         Original published format: FR 9712275
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917952
Date:15.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019264
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019264
Date:12.05.2004
Language:FR
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/02, B60R21/00
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Übertragungsvorrichtung von Signalen zwischen dem Kraftfahrzeug-Steuersystem und der Sicherheitseinrichtung eines herausnehmbaren Sitzes dieses Fahrzeuges[2003/39]
English:Signal Transmitting Device between the Control System of a Motor Vehicle and the Safety Equipment of a Removable Seat of that Vehicle[2003/39]
French:Dispositif de transmission de signaux entre le système de commande d'un véhicule automobile et l'équipement de sécurité d'un siège amovible de celui-ci[2003/39]
Former [2000/29]VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SIGNALEN ZWISCHEN DEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG-STEUERSYSTEM UND DER SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG EINES HERAUSNEHMBAREN SITZES DIESES FAHRZEUGES
Former [2000/29]UI
Former [2000/29]DISPOSITIF POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX ENTRE LE SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET L'EQUIPEMENT DE SECURITE D'UN SIEGE AMOVIBLE DE CELUI-CI
Entry into regional phase04.04.2000National basic fee paid 
04.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
14.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2004Fee for grant paid
10.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.05.2004
[2008/16]
Cited inInternational search[T]EP0802093  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [T] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1,10-13 *;
 [T]DE19644219  (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [T] 1-10 * figures 1-7; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4008243  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19519130  (PARS PASSIVE RUECKHALTESYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP0615879  (MATRA AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *