Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037527

EP1037527 - MICROCAPSULES WITH READILY ADJUSTABLE RELEASE RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monsanto Technology LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
[2001/29]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
MONSANTO COMPANY
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SEITZ, Michael, E.
16410 Hickory Pine Lane
Ellisville, MO 63011 / US
02 / BRINKER, Ronald, J.
925 Oakgrove Park Court
Ellisville, MO 63021 / US
03 / TRAVERS, Jeff, N.
14573 Bexhill Court
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272
1150 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Bosch, Henry , et al
Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1
1150 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date98946830.103.09.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US18373
Priority number, dateUS1997092467105.09.1997         Original published format: US 924671
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911122
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037527
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037527
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/28, A01N37/26, C08G18/70
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Extension statesAL06.03.2000
LT06.03.2000
LV06.03.2000
MK06.03.2000
RO06.03.2000
SI06.03.2000
TitleGerman:MIKROKAPSELN MIT EINFACH EINSTELLBARER ABGABERATE[2000/39]
English:MICROCAPSULES WITH READILY ADJUSTABLE RELEASE RATES[2000/39]
French:MICROCAPSULES A TAUX DE LIBERATION FACILEMENT AJUSTABLE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2000National basic fee paid 
06.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
18.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
PT17.05.2004
IE03.09.2004
LU03.09.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
CY17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
IE03.09.2004
LU03.09.2004
Former [2005/46]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
IE03.09.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/46]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT17.12.2003
FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4738898  (VIVANT GILBERT [FR]) [X] 1,7-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5225118  (JUANG MIKE S D [US], et al) [Y] 1-99 * see: col. 4, lines 45 - 64; col. 7, line 60 - col. 8, line 37. *;
 [Y]US4193889  (BAATZ GUNTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-99 * column 2, lines 22-56 *;
 [DY]US4280833  (BEESTMAN GEORGE B, et al) [DY] 1-99 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9213450  (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) [Y] 1-99 * page 7, paragraph 4 *