Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009328

EP1009328 - SHORT BODY ENDOPROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R. Bard, Inc.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
C.R. Bard Inc.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUJAWSKI, Dennis
71 Coppergate Lane
Warwick, NY 10990 / US
02 / WEISER, Michael, F.
516 Martin's Pond Road
Groton, MA 01450 / US
 [2001/36]
Former [2000/25]01 / KUJAWSKI, Dennis
25 Parker Road
Brookline, NH 03033 / US
02 / WEISER, Michael, F.
516 Martin's Pond Road
Groton, MA 01450 / US
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date98946880.604.09.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US18662
Priority number, dateUS1997092580905.09.1997         Original published format: US 925809
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911199
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009328
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009328
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:KURZE ENDOPROTHESE[2000/25]
English:SHORT BODY ENDOPROSTHESIS[2000/25]
French:ENDOPROTHESE A CORPS COURT[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2000National basic fee paid 
05.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2005Fee for grant paid
27.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200104   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
SE30.06.2005
CY04.09.2005
PT07.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/21]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
CY04.09.2005
PT07.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2007/18]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI30.03.2005
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9807389  (COOK INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-10,12,21 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9717912  (CORVITA CORP [US]) [A] 1,21 * page 19, line 3 - page 22, line 15; figures 18-28 *;
 [A]EP0792627  (CARDIOVASCULAR CONCEPTS INC [US]) [A] 1,21 * column 12, line 45 - column 13, line 15; figures 7-12 *;
 [DA]DE9319267U  (VORWERK DIERK DR [DE], et al)
by applicantWO9528918