Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032254

EP1032254 - PLANT SPRAY SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Randle, John B.
228 Shady Oaks Circle
Lake Mary, FL 32746 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Finck, Dieter , et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Patentanwälte
Mariahilfplatz 2-3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing. , et al
v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98946910.110.09.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US18799
Priority number, dateUS1997092816312.09.1997         Original published format: US 928163
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9913712
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032254
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032254
Date:23.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01C15/00, A01G15/00, A01M7/00
[2000/48]
Former International [2000/36]A01C15/00, A01G15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/36]
TitleGerman:ABSCHIRMUNG FÜR PFLANZENSPRÜHVORRICHTUNG[2000/36]
English:PLANT SPRAY SHIELD[2000/36]
French:ECRAN DE PULVERISATEUR POUR VEGETAUX[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2000National basic fee paid 
12.04.2000Search fee paid 
12.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
10.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2003Fee for grant paid
20.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5196065  (JOZWIAK WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 33 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]GB1555771  (STEDWAY PRODUCTS LTD) [A] 1,4 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE1771094  (MACK ALEXANDER) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
International search[X]US5060417  (COURT EDWARD H [US]);
 [Y]US3374897  (MARTIN JOHN C);
 [Y]US4199896  (LEHMAN VERNE E [US])
by applicantUS5499474
 US5606822
 US5329727
 US4199896
 US3267610
 US1598628
 US5196065
 US2812784