Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021268

EP1021268 - PROCESS OF USING AN ACTIVE SOLDER ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EUROMAT Gesellschaft für Werkstofftechnologie und Transfer mbH
Gladbacher Strasse 21
52525 Heinsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
EUROMAT Gesellschaft für Werkstofftechnologie und Transfer GmbH
Gladbacher Strasse 21
52525 Heinsberg / DE
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Euromat GmbH
Angewandte Werstoff-und Oberflächentechnologie, Rheinstrasse 7
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Ronald, W.
1162 Horseshoe Drive
Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US
02 / LUGSCHEIDER, Erich
Steppenbergallee 201
52074 Achen / DE
03 / RASS, Ino J.
Büchel 19-21
520262 Aachen / DE
04 / HILLEN, Frank
Mazurenweg 72
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Flasskuhle 6
58452 Witten / DE
Application number, filing date98946960.614.09.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998US19004
Priority number, dateUS19970058673P12.09.1997         Original published format: US 58673 P
US1998015148911.09.1998         Original published format: US 151489
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912689
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021268
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23K1/00, B23K35/26, B23K1/06, B23K1/20, B23K3/06
[2002/01]
Former International [2000/30]B23K1/00, B23K1/19, B23K35/26
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BENUTZUNG EINER AKTIVEN LÖTLEGIERUNG[2000/30]
English:PROCESS OF USING AN ACTIVE SOLDER ALLOY[2000/30]
French:PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN ALLIAGE DE SOUDAGE ACTIF[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2000National basic fee paid 
29.03.2000Search fee paid 
29.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
23.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO9703789  (EUROMAT GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-4,11,13,16,19,20,23,24,27,30,33-35,37 * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 20; claims 28-37 *;
 [Y]US1340264  (JOHN DEAN) [Y] 1-4,11,13,16,19,20 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]US3066406  (WHITE PHILIP R) [Y] 23,24,27,30,33-35,37 * column 3, lines 10-60; figures 3,6,7 *;
 [A]US2087716  (CARL BANSCHER) [A] 1,4,6,17,23,28,33 * page 1, column R, line 24 - page 2, column L, line 60 * * page 3, column R, line 58 - page 4, column L, line 24; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]GB1357073  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 4,23,32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5340015  (HIRA GOVIND L [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 18; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS5897479  ;
 [E]WO9902299  (EUROMAT GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-39 * page 7, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830903), vol. 007, no. 199, Database accession no. (M - 240), [A] 7 * abstract *
International search[A]US4451541  (BEAL ROY E [US]);
 [A]US4785989  (MIZUHARA HOWARD [US], et al);
 [A]US5011511  (BECK ALEXANDER [CH]);
 [A]US5598966  (ROMANO TIMOTHY S [US], et al);
 [AP]US5695861  (BLOOM TERRY R [US])