Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003875

EP1003875 - GROUP A STREPTOCOCCAL VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF TENNESSEE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
1534 White Avenue, Suite 403
Knoxville, TN 37996-1527 / US
[2006/52]
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF TENNESSEE RESEARCH CORPORATION
1534 White Avenue, Suite 403
Knoxville, TN 37996-1527 / US
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Dale, James B.
72 Lombardi Road
Memphis, TN 38111 / US
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
ID Vaccine
Suite 100, 19204 North Creek Parkway
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DALE, James, B.
72 Lombardy Road
Memphis, TN 38111 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/22]Doireau, Marc , et al
Cabinet Orès 6, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98946991.114.09.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998US19100
Priority number, dateUS19970058635P12.09.1997         Original published format: US 58635 P
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913084
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003875
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003875
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C12N15/62, C07K14/315, A61K39/09, A61K39/39
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:GRUPPE A STREPTOKOKKEN-IMPFSTOFF[2000/22]
English:GROUP A STREPTOCOCCAL VACCINES[2000/22]
French:VACCIN A BASE DE STREPTOCOQUES DU GROUPE A[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2000National basic fee paid 
14.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
10.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
31.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2006Fee for grant paid
06.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06026584.0  / EP1801217
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2006
CH27.12.2006
CY27.12.2006
DK27.12.2006
FI27.12.2006
LI27.12.2006
NL27.12.2006
SE27.03.2007
GR28.03.2007
PT28.05.2007
IE14.09.2007
LU14.09.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/45]AT27.12.2006
CH27.12.2006
DK27.12.2006
FI27.12.2006
LI27.12.2006
NL27.12.2006
SE27.03.2007
GR28.03.2007
PT28.05.2007
IE14.09.2007
Former [2008/21]AT27.12.2006
CH27.12.2006
DK27.12.2006
FI27.12.2006
LI27.12.2006
NL27.12.2006
SE27.03.2007
GR28.03.2007
PT28.05.2007
Former [2008/16]AT27.12.2006
CH27.12.2006
DK27.12.2006
FI27.12.2006
LI27.12.2006
NL27.12.2006
SE27.03.2007
PT28.05.2007
Former [2007/29]AT27.12.2006
FI27.12.2006
SE27.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9406421  (UNIV TENNESSEE RES CORP [US]) [Y] 4,8-10 * page 12 - page 13; figures 1-13 *;
 [X]  - BEACHEY E H ET AL, "PROTECTIVE IMMUNOGENICITY AND T LYMPHOCYTE SPECIFICITY OF A TRIVALENT HYBIRD PEPTIDE CONTAINING NH2-TERMINAL SEQUENCES OF TYPES 5, 6, AND 24 M PROTEINS SYNTHESIZED IN TANDEM", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (19870901), vol. 166, no. 3, pages 647 - 656, XP000618953 [X] 1-3,5-7,11 * page 647, paragraph L; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.166.3.647
 [DY]  - DALE J B ET AL, "Recombinant, octavalent group A streptococcal M protein vaccine", VACCINE, (199607), vol. 14, no. 10, page 944-948, XP004057623 [DY] 4,8-10 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(96)00050-3
 [DY]  - DALE J B ET AL, "RECOMBINANT TETRAVALENT GROUP A STREPTOCOCCAL M PROTEIN VACCINE", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19930815), vol. 151, no. 4, pages 2188 - 2194, XP000645174 [DY] 4,8-10 * figure 1; tables III,V *
 [Y]  - BEACHEY E H ET AL, "OPSONIC ANTIBODIES EVOKED BY HYBRID PEPTIDE COPES OF TYPES 5 AND 24 STREPTOCOCCAL M PROTEINS SYNTHESIZED IN TANDEM", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (198606), vol. 163, no. 6, pages 1451 - 1458, XP000645526 [Y] 4,8-10 * page 1456, paragraph L; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.163.6.1451
 [Y]  - WISTEDT A C ET AL, "Identification of a plasminogen-binding motif in PAM, a bacterial surface protein", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (1995), vol. 18, pages 569 - 578, XP002092777 [Y] 4,8-10 * page 572, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1995.mmi_18030569.x