EP1021429 - ARYL FURAN DERIVATIVES AS PDE IV INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | 14.05.2004 | Change - representative | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK FROSST CANADA INC. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states MERCK FROSST CANADA INC. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRIER, Helene 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 02 /
HAN, Yongxin 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 03 /
BAYLY, Christopher 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 04 /
MacDONALD, Dwight 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 05 /
GIROUX, Andre 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | 06 /
YOUNG, Robert, N. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland, Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98947246.9 | 01.10.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998CA00930 | Priority number, date | US19970061261P | 03.10.1997 Original published format: US 61261 P | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918095 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021429 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/42, A61K31/34, C07D307/38, C07D307/46, C07D307/54, C07D307/56, C07D307/64, C07D307/66, C07D473/38, C07D405/04, C07D405/12, C07D417/12, C07D413/12, C07D405/06, C07F7/08 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C07D307/42 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D307/46 (EP,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07F7/0814 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Extension states | AL | 03.05.2000 | LT | 03.05.2000 | LV | 03.05.2000 | MK | 03.05.2000 | RO | 03.05.2000 | SI | 03.05.2000 | Title | German: | ARYL-FURAN-DERIVATE ALS PDE IV HEMMER | [2000/30] | English: | ARYL FURAN DERIVATIVES AS PDE IV INHIBITORS | [2000/30] | French: | DERIVES D'ARYLFURANE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE PHOSPHODIESTERASE IV (PDE IV) | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9638412 ; | [X]JPH0912457 ; | [X]WO9700068 ; | [X]JPS59161390 ; | [X]JPH09194471 ; | [X]US3531497 (YOUNGDALE GILBERT A) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3557005 (BROADDUS CHARLES D) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US4595693 (BIFTU TESFAYE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 5 - column 6 *; | [X]EP0318066 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-15 * see claims and compound 24 *; | [X]EP0678296 (TSUMURA & CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X] - WATANABE ET AL., "Preparation of lignan compounds as ...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910225), vol. 114, no. 8, Database accession no. 69042, XP002088109 [X] 1,5-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 03, Database accession no. 97-034276, XP002088115 & WO9638412 A 19961205 (TSUMURA & CO) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 12, Database accession no. 97-128649, XP002088116 & JPH0912457 A 19970114 (TSUMURA & CO) [X] 1,5-8,10-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 07, Database accession no. 97-077348, XP002088117 & WO9700068 A 19970103 (TSUMURA & CO) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11-13 * abstract * | [X] - GUMP ET AL., "Copper(I)substitutions. Furans from ...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19680506), vol. 68, no. 19, Database accession no. 87079, XP002088110 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - TRAVERSO, "Intermediates necessary in the synthesis...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19610306), vol. 55, no. 5, column 4468, XP002088111 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - KUMAR ET AL., "Synthesis of 3-alkoxy, 3-aryloxy and 3-substituted amino-2,5-diarylfurans ...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950814), vol. 123, no. 7, Database accession no. 83120, XP002088112 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - IYER ET AL., "Potential antifertility agents...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19740610), vol. 80, no. 23, Database accession no. 133166, XP002088113 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 43, Database accession no. 84-265910, XP002088118 & JPS59161390 A 19840912 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 40, Database accession no. 97-431452, XP002088119 & JPH09194471 A 19970729 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - WATANABE ET AL., "An efficient synthesis of 2(5H)-furanone and furan derivatives...", CHEM.PHARM.BULL., (1989), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 2914 - 2919, XP002088108 [X] 1,2,5 * page 2917 * | [X] - DAS B P ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ANTIPROTOZOAL ACTIVITY OF 2,5-BIS(4-GUANYLPHENYL) FURANS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (197704), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 531 - 536, XP000605199 [X] 1,2,5 * page 532 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00214a014 | [X] - AUTERHOFF ET AL., "Guaiac resins...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19661121), vol. 65, no. 11, column 16925, XP002088114 [X] 1,5 * abstract * |