Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999823

EP0999823 - COMPOSITION FOR DYEING KERATIN FIBRES AND DYEING METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2011Change - classificationpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
02.09.2011Change - classificationpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
02.09.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2011/40]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RONDEAU, Christine
10 bis, rue de Verdun
F-78500 Sartrouville / FR
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard , et al
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Dossmann, Gérard , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/30]Dossmann, Gérard , et al
Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Dossmann, Gérard , et al
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/20]Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98947623.907.10.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998FR02145
Priority number, dateFR1997001324022.10.1997         Original published format: FR 9713240
[2000/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920235
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999823
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999823
Date:16.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/25]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0999823
Date:05.10.2011
Language:FR
[2011/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61Q5/06, A61K8/49
[2011/40]
Former International [2000/20]A61K7/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:FÄRBEMITTEL FÜR KERATINISCHE FASER UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2000/20]
English:COMPOSITION FOR DYEING KERATIN FIBRES AND DYEING METHOD USING SAME[2000/20]
French:COMPOSITION DE TEINTURE DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES ET PROCEDE DE TEINTURE METTANT EN OEUVRE CETTE COMPOSITION[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase22.07.1999National basic fee paid 
22.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/20]
07.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2004Fee for grant paid
31.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04290396.3  / EP1437123
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Pfungstädterstrasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 02  16.03.2005  23.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2009/49]
Former [2005/19]
Opponent(s)01  15.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Pfungstädterstrasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 02  16.03.2005  23.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2005/18]
Opponent(s)01  15.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH
Pfungstädterstrasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
21.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.10.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
02.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
29.03.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.09.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.09.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.03.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.06.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.07.2007Appeal received No.  T1050/07
12.09.2007Statement of grounds filed
07.07.2007Appeal received No.  T1050/07
22.10.2009Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.06.2007Appeal received No.  T1050/07
22.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:14.08.2003Request for further processing filed
14.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
LU07.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
DK31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
PT07.04.2009
NL01.05.2009
[2010/06]
Former [2007/18]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
LU07.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/19]FI16.06.2004
IE16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE16.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US4025301  (G.LANG) [X] 1,6,7,13-18,25-27 * claims 1,2,12,13 * * column 2, lines 35-38 * * example 9 *;
 [X]US3985499  (G.LANG, A.BUGAUT) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13,16,25-27 * claims 1,6 * * columns 9-14 * * example 45 *
OppositionDE29607212U
 DE3423349
 DE3131409
 WO9501772
 WO9515144