Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991660

EP0991660 - DEUTERATED and undeuterated CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE AS IMMUNOMODULATING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]DEUTERATED CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE AS IMMUNOMODULATING AGENTS
[2005/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISOTECHNIKA, INC.
2100 College Plaza, 8215 - 112th Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2CB / CA
[N/P]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
ISOTECHNIKA, INC.
2100 College Plaza, 8215 112th Street Edmonton
Alberta T6G 2CB / CA
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
Isotechnika, Inc.
17208 - 108 Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T5S 1E8 / CA
For all designated states
Naicker, Selvaraj
3304-117th Street Edmonton
Alberta T6J 3J4 / CA
For all designated states
Yatscoff, Randall W.
215 Buchanan Close Edmonton
Alberta T6R 2B7 / CA
For all designated states
Foster, Robert T.
4211-120 Street Edmonton
Alberta T6J 1X9 / CA
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Isotechnika, Inc.
17208 - 108 Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T5S 1E8 / CA
For all designated states
Naicker, Selvaraj
3304-117th Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 3J4 / CA
For all designated states
Yatscoff, Randall W.
215 Buchanan Close
Edmonton, Alberta T6R 2B7 / CA
For all designated states
Foster, Robert T.
4211-120 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 1X9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / NAICKER, S., Selvaraj
3304 - 117th Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 3J4 / CA
02 / YATSCOFF, Randall, W.
215 Buchanan Close
Edmonton, Alberta T6R 2B7 / CA
03 / FOSTER, Robert, T.
4211 - 120 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T6J 1X9 / CA
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98947718.708.10.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998IB01693
Priority number, dateUS19970061360P08.10.1997         Original published format: US 61360 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918120
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991660
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991660
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0991660
Date:05.04.2006
[2006/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/64, A61K38/13
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/15]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesRO31.01.2000
TitleGerman:DEUTERIERtE und undeuterierte CYCLOSPORIN-ANALOGA UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS IMMUNMODULIERENDE AGENtIEN[2005/23]
English:DEUTERATED and undeuterated CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE AS IMMUNOMODULATING AGENTS[2005/23]
French:ANALOGUES DE CYCLOSPORINE DEUTERES et non-deuteres ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME IMMUNOMODULATEURS[2005/23]
Former [2000/15]DEUTERIERDE CYCLOSPORIN-ANALOGA UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS IMMUNMODULIERENDE AGENZIEN
Former [2000/15]DEUTERATED CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE AS IMMUNOMODULATING AGENTS
Former [2000/15]ANALOGUES DE CYCLOSPORINE DEUTERES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME IMMUNOMODULATEURS
Entry into regional phase31.01.2000National basic fee paid 
31.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
14.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2005Fee for grant paid
12.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05024216.3  / EP1645565
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.12.2005
[2009/02]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0373260  (MERCK & CO INC [US]);
 [X]EP0283801  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0577544  (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9526325  (ISOTECHNIKA INC [CA])
 [X]  - D. SEEBACH ET AL., "MODIFICATION OF CYCLOSPORIN A (CS): GENERATION OF AN ENOLATE AT THESARCOSINE RESIDUE AND REACTIONS WITH ELECTROPHILES", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 76, pages 1564 - 1590, XP002022424 [X] 1,2,4,8,9 *compound 1*; page 1576 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19930760415
 [X]  - H. KOBEL ET AL., "Contribution to knowledge of the biosynthesis of cyclosporin A", EXPERIENTIA, (1983), vol. 39, pages 873 - 876, XP002090783 [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * page 874, column 2, paragraph L - page 875, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01990413
 [X]  - EBERLE M K ET AL, "Modifications of the MeBmt Side Chain of Cyclosporin A", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19950803), vol. 5, no. 15, page 1725-1728, XP004135415 [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(95)00281-W