Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028099

EP1028099 - FIBROUS COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
For all designated states
ACROSS CO., LTD.
16-27, Nishiki-cho 2-chome Warabi-City
Saitama-Prefecture 335-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
For all designated states
ACROSS CO., LTD.
16-27, Nishiki-cho 2-chome Warabi-City
Saitama-Prefecture 335-0005 / JP
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
For all designated states
ACROSS CO., LTD.
16-27, Nishiki-cho 2-chome
Warabi-City, Saitama-Prefecture 335-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HANZAWA, Shigeru
72, Shin-unumadai 2-chome
Kagamihara-city Gifu-prefecture 509-0122 / JP
02 / NAKAGAWA, Takao
11-14, Uchiya 3-chome
Urawa-city Saitama-prefecture 336-0034 / JP
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98947765.807.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998JP04523
Priority number, dateJP1997027777209.10.1997         Original published format: JP 27777297
JP1998012822622.04.1998         Original published format: JP 12822698
JP1998020423706.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20423798
JP1998026746204.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26746298
[2000/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919273
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028099
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028099
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search reportJP22.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/80, C04B35/573, C04B41/88
[2004/12]
Former International [2000/33]C04B41/88
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:FASERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2000/33]
English:FIBROUS COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/33]
French:MATERIAU COMPOSITE FIBREUX ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase25.05.1999Translation filed 
08.06.1999National basic fee paid 
08.06.1999Search fee paid 
08.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/33]
22.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2007Fee for grant paid
07.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07006006.6  / EP1818320
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2008   
SGL CARBON AG
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander
European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
 02  25.01.2008   
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/10]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2008   
SGL CARBON AG
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander
European Patent Attorney, Bahnhofstrasse 26A
55218 Ingelheim / DE
 02  25.01.2008   
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
29.02.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.09.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.10.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.10.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/46]
Appeal following opposition05.01.2010Appeal received No.  T0006/10
05.03.2010Statement of grounds filed
01.10.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
CY25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
LU07.10.2007
IE08.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/48]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
IE08.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/26]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/21]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/16]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
ES05.08.2007
PT25.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9722815  (SAB WABCO BROMBOROUGH LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,5,20 * * page 12, line 7 - line 8 * * example 1 *;
 [DA]GB1457757  (SECR DEFENCE) [DA] 1-11 * claim - * * example - *
International search[A]JPS6325273
 [A]JPH05186266
 [A]JPH05186276
 [A]JPS4942705