Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976627

EP0976627 - BRAKE CONTROLLER OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.2007  [2007/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2006/52]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUGIMOTO, Yoichi, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / ICHIKAWA, Shoji, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / URAI, Yoshihiro, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
04 / HADA, Satoshi, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2006/52]
Former [2000/05]01 / SUGIMOTO, Yoichi, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / ICHIKAWA, Shoji, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / URAI, Yoshihiro, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193a 351-0193 / JP
04 / HADA, Satoshi, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Weickmann und Partner, Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date98947892.015.10.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998JP04669
Priority number, dateJP1998003566218.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3566298
[2000/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942347
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976627
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976627
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60T7/12, B60T8/00, B60T8/32, B60T7/22, B60T13/72
[2004/25]
Former International [2000/05]B60T7/12, B60T8/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:BREMSSTEUERGERÄT FÜR FAHRZEUGE[2000/05]
English:BRAKE CONTROLLER OF VEHICLE[2000/05]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE FREIN DE VEHICULE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1999Translation filed 
16.09.1999National basic fee paid 
16.09.1999Search fee paid 
16.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2006Fee for grant paid
10.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH08310359  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [X]JPH0539011  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [X]JPH07315187  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [Y]JPH04121260  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [Y]JPH0834326  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [E]JPH10315938  (UNYUSHO SENPAKU GIJUTSU KENKYU);
 [A]JPH05286427  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP)