Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046149

EP1046149 - SYSTEM FOR WARNING OF TRAFFIC INCIDENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Burst Electronics AS
Postboks 2002
3202 Sandefjord / NO
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSENBERG, Morten
Stadionveien 3B
N-3214 Sandefjord / NO
02 / EVENSEN, Jan
Furustadlia 51
N-3232 Sandefjord / NO
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Nielsen, Leif , et al
Patrade A/S
Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Nielsen, Leif , et al
Patrade A/S Aaboulevarden 21
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date98947994.405.10.1998
[2000/43]
WO1998NO00299
Priority number, dateNO1997000580210.12.1997         Original published format: NO 975802
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930303
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046149
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search reportSE17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/0965
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:WARNSYSTEM FÜR VERKEHRSUNFÄLLE[2000/43]
English:SYSTEM FOR WARNING OF TRAFFIC INCIDENTS[2000/43]
French:SYSTEME D'AVERTISSEMENT LIE AUX ACCIDENTS DE LA CIRCULATION[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2000National basic fee paid 
03.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
03.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
06.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.08.2000M01   Fee paid on   16.08.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4794394  (HALSTEAD THOMAS L [US]);
 [Y]US4626849  (SIMS JOHN C [US]);
 [A]US3673560  (BARSH MAX K, et al);
 [A]DE4123857  (DIECKMANN KARL HEINZ [DE])