Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027151

EP1027151 - PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USE OF ANIONIC CLAY MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB, GR
published on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intercat-Savannah, Inc.
P.O. Box 412
Sea Girt, NJ 08750 / US
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / VIERHEILIG, Albert, A.
330 Washington Avenue
Savannah, GA 31450 / US
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Knott, Stephen Gilbert , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Knott, Stephen Gilbert , et al
MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date98948188.215.09.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998US19081
Priority number, dateUS1997095501720.10.1997         Original published format: US 955017
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920389
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027151
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1027151
Date:07.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Search report(s)International search reportUS29.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/16, C01B13/36, C01F7/00
[2002/13]
Former International [2000/33]B01J21/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:PROZESS ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG VON ANIONISCHEN LEHM MATERIALIEN[2000/33]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USE OF ANIONIC CLAY MATERIALS[2000/33]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE MATERIAU ARGILEUX ANIONIQUE[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2000National basic fee paid 
15.05.2000Search fee paid 
15.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2008Fee for grant paid
20.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2009   
ALBEMARLE CORPORATION
451 Florida Street Baton Rouge
Louisiana 70801 / US
Opponent's representative
Derks, Wilbert, et al
Howrey LLP
Rembrandt Tower
Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2009/12]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2009   
ALBEMARLE CORPORATION
451 Florida Street Baton Rouge
Louisiana 70801 / US
Opponent's representative
Derks, Wilbert, et al
Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein 1, 31st Floor
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
13.03.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.01.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200104   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2002
30.09.200205   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
GB15.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
FR30.09.2009
Former [2010/06]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
IT07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT07.05.2008
BE07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
ES18.08.2008
Former [2008/47]ES18.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0421678  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [X] 21-31 * page 1, line 25 - page 1, line 46 * * example - *;
 [X]US5645810  (EASLEY MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 21-31 * column 3, line 30 - column 3, line 47 * * claim - *;
 [A]US5114898  (PINNAVAIA THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5426083  (BHATTACHARYYA ALAKANANDA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 52 *
International search[X]US5112784  (ATKINS MARTIN P [GB], et al);
 [X]US5358701  (PINNAVAIA THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5334564  (PINNAVAIA THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [A]US5591418  (BHATTACHARYYA ALAKANANDA [US], et al)