Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979174

EP0979174 - CURLED FINGER HINGE BINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2002  [2002/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DUO-TANG, INC.
828 Duo Tang Road
Paw Paw, MI 49079 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MULLIN, Howard
86 Kilroy Way
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
02 / HONEKER, Klaus
260 Cinnabar Road
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Kiliaridis, Constantin , et al
Bugnion S.A.
10, Route de Florissant
Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Kiliaridis, Constantin , et al
Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
Application number, filing date98948200.511.09.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US19114
Priority number, dateUS1997092933713.09.1997         Original published format: US 929337
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914060
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979174
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:B42F13/18
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:ORDNER MIT SCHWINGBAREN RINGEN[2000/07]
English:CURLED FINGER HINGE BINDER[2000/07]
French:CLASSEUR ARTICULE A DOIGTS ARRONDIS[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
30.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/16]
14.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]CH265525  (SCHOELER W F [CH]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 9,10,13,14;
 [A]FR2233817  (ANATOLE JEAN [FR]) [A] 1,5,9,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2385540  (TOMITA SANGYO KK [JP]);
 [A]FR1585542  (GRUNWITZ HEINZ)