Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1082591

EP1082591 - SENSING TAPES FOR STRAIN AND/OR TEMPERATURE SENSING AND PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/11]SENSING TAPES FOR STRAIN AND/OR TEMPERATURE SENSING
[2004/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Harmeet
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]von Kirschbaum, Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2001/11]von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98948286.416.09.1998
[2001/11]
WO1998US19336
Priority number, dateUS1998008484226.05.1998         Original published format: US 84842
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961875
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082591
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1082591
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01L1/24
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/11]
TitleGerman:SENSORBÄNDER ZUR MESSUNG VON SPANNUNG UND/ODER TEMPERATUR UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2004/51]
English:SENSING TAPES FOR STRAIN AND/OR TEMPERATURE SENSING AND PRODUCING THE SAME[2004/51]
French:BANDE DE DETECTION PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LA CONTRAINTE ET/OU LA TEMPERATURE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION[2004/51]
Former [2001/11]SENSORBÄNDER ZUR MESSUNG VON SPANNUNG UND/ODER TEMPERATUR
Former [2001/11]SENSING TAPES FOR STRAIN AND/OR TEMPERATURE SENSING
Former [2001/11]BANDE DE DETECTION PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LA CONTRAINTE ET/OU LA TEMPERATURE
Entry into regional phase20.10.2000National basic fee paid 
20.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
21.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2005Fee for grant paid
17.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.05.2005
IT18.05.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]IT18.05.2005
FR30.09.2005
Former [2008/16]IT18.05.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US5723857  (UNDERWOOD FIONA [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,9,11-14,19-22 * column 1, line 21 - line 27 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 60 - line 67; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0384649  (SIMMONDS PRECISION PRODUCTS [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,19-22 * column 2, line 17 - line 25 * * column 2, line 45 - line 53 * * column 5, line 1 - line 14 *;
 [A]US4806012  (MELTZ GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-10,22,23 * column 2, line 21 - line 31 * * figure 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9812525  (MC DONNELL DOUGLAS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-18,22,23 * page 11, line 18 - line 27 * * figure 1 *
 [A]  - CLAUS R O ET AL, "EMBEDDED OPTICAL FIBER SENSORS FOR MATERIALS EVALUTION", JOURNAL OF NONDESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION, (19890601), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 135 - 145, XP000162097 [A] 1-10,22,23 * page 135, column R, paragraph L - page 136, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 144, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00565637