Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015768

EP1015768 - BIASED SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR HIGH PRESSURE FLUID PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
23500 64th Avenue South Kent
Washington 98032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
23500 64th Avenue South
Kent, Washington 98032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TREMOULET, Olivier, L., Jr.
18344 Andover Street
Edmonds, WA 98026 / US
02 / RAGHAVAN, Chidambaram
20813 126th Avenue Southeast
Kent, WA 98031 / US
03 / MADDEN, Katherine, M.
23633 112th Avenue, S.E. D-101
Kent, WA 98038 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98948308.617.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US19410
Priority number, dateUS1997093269018.09.1997         Original published format: US 932690
US1998007170601.05.1998         Original published format: US 71706
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914500
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015768
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015768
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:F04B53/16
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSANORDUNG UNTER VORSPANNUNG FÜR EINE HOCHDRUCKPUMPE[2000/27]
English:BIASED SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR HIGH PRESSURE FLUID PUMP[2000/27]
French:ENSEMBLE JOINT SOLLICITE POUR POMPE A LIQUIDE SOUS PRESSION ELEVEE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2000National basic fee paid 
14.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
30.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2003Fee for grant paid
04.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:10
For:all designated states
Date:02.02.2003
[2003/49]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
CY14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
PT14.06.2004
IE17.09.2004
LU17.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
CY14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
IE17.09.2004
LU17.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2006/12]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
IE17.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/46]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
IE17.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/02]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
DK14.04.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2005/01]AT14.01.2004
BE14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/44]AT14.01.2004
CH14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
LI14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/43]AT14.01.2004
FI14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/41]FI14.01.2004
GR14.04.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/40]FI14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US3776558  (MAURER W, et al) [X] 1-8,10,12-14,18-20,22,24,25,28-30,33-35 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 36 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4448574  (SHIMIZU SACHIO [JP]) [A] 1,7,9,24,26,29,31 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 30 * * figure 2 *;
 [EA]EP0870956  (NIKUNI MACHINERY IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 29-35 * figure 1 * [A] 1,7,11-17,19-21,24-28