blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1015042 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1015042



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 275
11.02.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
31.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.01.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.01.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.11.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
21.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
21.01.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
18.01.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 9
13.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.03.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.03.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 3
22.03.2001 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.12.2000 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 2
30.11.2000 Loss of priority right Search / examination 2
01.09.2000 Annex Search / examination 5
01.09.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.09.2000 Priority document Search / examination 50
28.08.2000 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
24.08.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
23.08.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
12.07.2000 Extension of time limit to file US priority document Search / examination 1
28.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
27.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
24.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.04.2000 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
05.04.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
04.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 7
04.04.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
04.04.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.12.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
26.11.1999 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
15.11.1999 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.1999 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.06.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.05.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.05.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.05.1999 Priority document Search / examination 42
20.04.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
19.04.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.04.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
19.04.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
22.03.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
22.03.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 55
06.01.1999 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1