blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1015042


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.02.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
29.10.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2003 Examination report or reply
08.04.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
08.04.2003 Renewal fee
14.01.2003 Examination report or reply
30.10.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.02.2002 Change - request for further processing
22.01.2002 Examination report or reply
22.01.2002 Change - request for further processing
08.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
03.10.2001 Renewal fee
11.07.2001 Examination report or reply
30.03.2001 First examination report
30.03.2001 Change - applicant published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
28.03.2001 Examination report or reply
13.12.2000 Loss of particular rights
27.11.2000 Loss of particular rights
13.09.2000 Renewal fee
19.05.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
19.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
18.04.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.04.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication