Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015042

EP1015042 - IMPROVED HYDROGEL FOR TISSUE ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Curis, Inc.
45 Moulton Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2001/20]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Reprogenesis, Inc
21 Erie Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BORLAND, Kermit, M.
43 Park Street
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
02 / OMSTEAD, Daniel, R.
2 Jay Lane
Acton, MA 07120 / US
03 / ZHOU, Tao
106 Reed Farm Road
Boxboro, MA 01719 / US
04 / NELSON, Gordon, P.
939 Mt. Hope Street
N. Attleboro, MA 02760 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Shah, Punita , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Shah, Punita , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date98948313.618.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US19417
Priority number, dateUS19970059558P19.09.1997         Original published format: US 59558 P
WO1997US0022810.12.1997         Original published format: PCT/US97/00228
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915211
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015042
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/00, A61L31/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES HYDROGEL FÜR DIE GEWEBETECHNOLOGIE[2000/27]
English:IMPROVED HYDROGEL FOR TISSUE ENGINEERING[2000/27]
French:HYDROGEL AMELIORE POUR CHIRURGIE REPARATRICE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2000National basic fee paid 
05.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
30.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
31.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/14]
Request for further processing for:18.01.2002Request for further processing filed
21.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200205   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9425080  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [DX] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9640304  (REPROGENESIS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,14-19 * page 16, line 17 - line 29; claim - *;
 [Y]DE4103876  (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-30 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9717038  (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [Y] 1-30 * page 10, line 18 - line 33; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0459733  (PROTAN BIOPOLYMER AS [NO]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 19 - line 58; claim - *;
 [A]EP0727232  (MENTOR CORP [US])