Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025484

EP1025484 - AUTONOMOUSLY CYCLING DATA PROCESSING ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Theseus Logic, Inc.
Suite 100, 3501 Quadrangle Boulevard
Orlanda, fl 32817 / US
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / FANT, Karl
1916 S.E. Franklin Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US
02 / KINNEY, Larry
1463 Glacier Lane, N.E.
Fridley, MN 55421 / US
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date98948450.623.09.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998US19831
Priority number, dateUS1997093661724.09.1997         Original published format: US 936617
[2000/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915956
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025484
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44
[2001/33]
Former International [2000/32]G06F3/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:AUTONOME ZKLUSDATENVERARBEITUNGSARCHITEKTUR[2000/32]
English:AUTONOMOUSLY CYCLING DATA PROCESSING ARCHITECTURE[2000/32]
French:ARCHITECTURE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES A ITERATION AUTONOME[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2000National basic fee paid 
19.04.2000Search fee paid 
19.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
05.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.200104   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2001
30.09.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8800732  (DENNIS JACK B [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]  ARVIND ET AL, "EXECUTING A PROGRAM ON THE MIT TAGGED-TOKEN DATAFLOW ARCHITECTURE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19900301), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 300 - 318, XP000103437 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 302, column 2, line 44 - page 315, column 1, line 15 * * figure 3 * * figure 18 * * figure 19 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.48862
 [A]  EVRIPIDOU P ET AL, "Incorporating input/output operations into dynamic data-flow graphs", PARALLEL COMPUTING,NL,ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19950801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0167-8191, pages 1285 - 1311, XP004062315 [A] 1-11 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8191(95)00021-F
International search[A]US5506998  (KATO HIDEKI [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5673423  (HILLIS W DANIEL [US])