Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019817

EP1019817 - SECURE MEMORY HAVING MULTIPLE SECURITY LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATMEL CORPORATION
2325 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
ATMEL CORPORATION
2325 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, California 95131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENHAMMOU, Jean-Pierre
610 Thames Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80906 / US
02 / BARAN, Dennis, F.
7980 Wildridge Road
Colorado Springs, CO 80908 / US
03 / TONGE, Phillip, D.
3604 Lancashire Street
Colorado Springs, CO 80907 / US
04 / TERRY, Edward, L., Jr.
104 Landoe Lane
Widefield, CO 80911 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]von Hellfeld, Axel , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2001/50]von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Basfeld, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9
59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE
Application number, filing date98948495.123.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US19944
Priority number, dateUS1997094351003.10.1997         Original published format: US 943510
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9918504
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019817
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019817
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G06F7/04, G07D7/00, G07F7/10, G06F12/14, G06F1/00
[2001/01]
Former International [2000/29]G06F11/00, G06F7/04, G07D7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:SICHERER SPEICHER MIT MULTIPLEN SICHERHEITSEBENEN[2000/29]
English:SECURE MEMORY HAVING MULTIPLE SECURITY LEVELS[2000/29]
French:MEMOIRE SûRE POSSEDANT PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX DE SECURITE[2002/35]
Former [2000/29]MEMOIRE SURE POSSEDANT PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX DE SECURITE
Entry into regional phase03.05.2000National basic fee paid 
03.05.2000Search fee paid 
03.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
06.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2002Fee for grant paid
27.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5473690  (GRIMONPREZ GEORGES [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 45 - line 57 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 67 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5014312  (LISIMAQUE GILLES [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 3, line 38 - line 45 *;
 [A]US4712177  (SCHRENK HARTMUT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 15 * * column 3, line 42 - line 45 *
 [Y]  GUEULLE P, "LES E2PROM SERIE SECURISEES", ELECTRONIQUE RADIO PLANS,FR,SPE, PARIS, (19930701), no. 548, ISSN 1144-5742, pages 23 - 28, XP000377636 [Y] 1 * page 26, column M, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 3 * * page 28, column L, line 15 - line 28 * * figure 14 *
International search[A]US5508691  (CASTLEMAN NEAL J [US], et al);
 [A]US5606315  (GASKINS RONALD E [US]);
 [AP]US5774546  (HANDELMAN DORON [IL], et al);
 [AP]US5699514  (DURINOVIC-JOHRI SANJA [US], et al);
 [A]US4758718  (FUJISAKI KUNIO [JP], et al)