Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019743

EP1019743 - BATTERY CAPACITY MEASUREMENT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hospira, Inc.
275 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
[2004/36]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CANNY, David
1703 Prudence Way
San Jose, CA 95116 / US
02 / CLARK, Gene, E.
3714 Red Oak Way
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
03 / HSU, Rupert
4974 Mise Avenue
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
04 / MASKE, Rudolph, J.
6770 Olive Branch Court
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98948594.130.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US20492
Priority number, dateUS1997094813709.10.1997         Original published format: US 948137
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9919737
Date:22.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1019743
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019743
Date:21.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:BATTERIEKAPAZITÄTSMESSANORDNUNG[2007/46]
English:BATTERY CAPACITY MEASUREMENT CIRCUIT[2000/29]
French:CIRCUIT DE MESURE DE LA CAPACITE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR[2000/29]
Former [2000/29]BATTERIEKAPAZITÄTMESSANORDNUNG
Entry into regional phase21.03.2000National basic fee paid 
21.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
08.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2008Fee for grant paid
20.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08154156.7  / EP2079149
Opposition(s)24.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
GR22.08.2008
CH30.09.2008
IE30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
LU30.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
CH30.09.2008
IE30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
LU30.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2010/06]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
CH30.09.2008
IE30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2121971  (LUCAS IND PLC) [X] 1,2,12,13 * see abstract; page 2, line 83 - line 123; figure 1 * [Y] 2-6,8-13;
 [Y]US5640150  (ATWATER TERRILL B [US]) [Y] 2-6,8-13 * figures 1,2 *;
 [L]US5841284  (TAKAHASHI SUSUMU [JP]) [L] 1-18 * cited for language reasons &JP08136628(fujitsu)31 May 1996;; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5527630  (NAGATA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9516200  (CURTIS INSTR [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *