Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025417

EP1025417 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF TRANSPARENT AND/OR DIFFUSIVE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FEDERALE DE LAUSANNE
Ecublens
1015 Lausanne / CH
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / LINDGREN, Goesta, Fredrik
Luthens Gränd 4B
S-118 66 Stockholm / SE
02 / SALATHE, René, Paul
Chemin de la Plantaz 25
CH-1024 Ecublens / CH
03 / WAELTI, Rudolf
Hubacherweg 33
CH-3097 Liebefeld / CH
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Roshardt, Werner Alfred
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys.
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach
3000 Bern 7 / CH
Application number, filing date98948659.223.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998CH00456
Priority number, dateCH1997000247023.10.1997         Original published format: CH 247097
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922198
Date:06.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025417
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025417
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, G01N21/45
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2000/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG VON OPTISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN TRANSPARENTER UND/ODER DIFFUSIVER GEGENSTÄNDE[2000/32]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF TRANSPARENT AND/OR DIFFUSIVE OBJECTS[2000/32]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DES CARACTERISTIQUES OPTIQUES D'OBJETS TRANSPARENTS ET/OU DIFFUSANTS[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2000National basic fee paid 
19.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
16.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2002Fee for grant paid
31.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0733877  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1,6,11,12 * page 13, line 46 - page 15, line 2 * * figure 16 *;
 [DY]WO9635100  (MERIDIAN AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1,6,11,12 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 27 *;
 [A]US4869593  (BIEGEN JAMES F [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0137946  (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-4 *