Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003989

EP1003989 - QUICK-ACTING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Südstrasse 125
53175 Bonn / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / NEUHAUS, Dietmar
Kaiserslauterner Strasse 32
D-40591 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98948825.912.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998EP05091
Priority number, dateDE199713484512.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734845
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9908030
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003989
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003989
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/00, F16K15/18
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/22]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLSCHALTENDES VENTIL[2000/22]
English:QUICK-ACTING VALVE[2000/22]
French:SOUPAPE A DECLENCHEMENT RAPIDE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
23.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.2002Fee for grant paid
31.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US3884417  (SHEFFIELD BERNARD RAYMOND, et al) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 42 *;
 [X]JPH0683460  ;
 [X]US4684104  (MICARD GUY [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 3 * * column 3, line 47 - line 57 *;
 [A]US3995813  (BART HANS U, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - line 59 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940628), vol. 018, no. 343, Database accession no. (P - 1761), [X] 1,3,4,7 * abstract * * figure 1 *
by applicantDE3835788
    - ÖLHYDRAULIK UND PNEUMATIK, (1994), vol. 38, no. 9, page 554-562,
    - VDI-Z 119, vol. 11-JUNI, no. 1, page 569-570,