Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015828

EP1015828 - LOW-TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MESSER GRIESHEIM GmbH
Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6
65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Messer Griesheim GmbH
Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6
65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH
Frankfurt Airport Center 1, C9, Hugo-Eckener-Ring
60547 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WALTER, Klaus-Peter
Am Pohlsberg 4
D-60388 Frankfurt / DE
02 / HOLLING, Bernd
Schwalmweg 1
D-47807 Krefeld / DE
03 / SENTIS, Theo
Feldburgweg 9
D-47918 Tönisvorst / DE
[2000/27]
Application number, filing date98948835.817.08.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998EP05181
Priority number, dateDE199713752128.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19737521
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911990
Date:11.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015828
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search reportEP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:F25J3/04
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR TIEFTEMPERATURZERLEGUNG VON LUFT[2000/27]
English:LOW-TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION INSTALLATION[2000/27]
French:INSTALLATION POUR LA DECOMPOSITION A BASSE TEMPERATURE DE L'AIR[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2000National basic fee paid 
28.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
10.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
06.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5408831  (GUILLARD ALAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,8 * column 3, line 12 - line 28; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5205042  (GRETER LUCIEN [FR], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,8 * column 2, line 34 - line 42 *;
 [DA]EP0538857  (LINDE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]FR2695714  (GRENIER MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 14 - line 18; figure -; claim - * * page 2, line 13 - line 19 * * page 5, line 11 - line 16 *;
 [A]US5349827  (BRACQUE GILLES [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]US5617742  (TOPPEL KARL O [US]) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [A]US3130561  (HNILICKA JR MILO P) [A] 1-11 * column W *