Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019208

EP1019208 - MOULD PIPE FOR A CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF STEELS, ESPECIALLY PERITECTIC STEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONCAST STANDARD AG
Tödistrasse 9
8027 Zürich / CH
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / STILLI, Adrian
Eichenweg 4
CH-8180 Bülach / CH
[2000/29]
Application number, filing date98948969.514.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998EP05828
Priority number, dateCH1997000229701.10.1997         Original published format: CH 229797
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916564
Date:08.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019208
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019208
Date:14.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/04
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:KOKILLENROHR FÜR EINE STRANGGIESSKOKILLE ZUM STRANGGIESSEN VON STÄHLEN, INSBESONDERE PERITEKTISCHEN STÄHLEN[2000/29]
English:MOULD PIPE FOR A CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF STEELS, ESPECIALLY PERITECTIC STEELS[2000/29]
French:TUBE POUR LINGOTIERE DE COULEE CONTINUE D'ACIERS, NOTAMMENT D'ACIERS PERITECTIQUES[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
06.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2002Fee for grant paid
25.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.08.2002
CY30.09.2002
DK14.11.2002
PT29.11.2002
[2005/21]
Former [2004/10]CY30.09.2002
DK14.11.2002
PT29.11.2002
Former [2003/46]DK14.11.2002
PT29.11.2002
Former [2003/22]PT29.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]JPH01224142  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 JPH01224142  [ ];
 [AD]JPH01170550  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 JPH01170550  [ ];
 [A]JPH026038  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 JPH026038  [ ];
 [A]SU904877  ;
 [A]DE1957332  (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0030308  (CONCAST AG [CH]) [A] 1 * figure .; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3909900  (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891205), vol. 013, no. 542, Database accession no. (M - 901), & JP01224142 A 19890907 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [ ] * abstract *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891004), vol. 013, no. 441, Database accession no. (M - 876), & JP01170550 A 19890705 (NKK CORP) [ ] * abstract *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900316), vol. 014, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 0950), & JP02006038 A 19900110 (NKK CORP) [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, 5, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 50, Database accession no. 82-08771J, XP002090740 & SU904877 A 19820215 (FERROUS METALLURGY INST) [A] 1 * abstract *