Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015947

EP1015947 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF PLATE-SHAPED WORK PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.09.2013  [2013/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOMAG MASCHINENBAU AG
Homagstrasse 5
D-72296 Schopfloch / DE
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / FREY, Karl
Goethestrasse 19
D-72296 Schopfloch / DE
02 / KALMBACH, Kurt
Tannenweg 1
D-72275 Alpirsbach / DE
03 / GRAF, Herbert
Heinrich-Schäff-Strasse 20
D-72280 Dornstetten / DE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98948970.314.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998EP05833
Priority number, dateDE199714116318.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19741163
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914645
Date:25.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015947
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015947
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   IT [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHLAUFBEARBEITUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN[2000/27]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS PROCESSING OF PLATE-SHAPED WORK PIECES[2000/27]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'USINAGE EN CONTINU DE PIECES EN FORME DE PLAQUES[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2000National basic fee paid 
30.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
09.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2003Fee for grant paid
21.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPS60144806  ;
 [XA]  - TSAI M C ET AL, "TRACKING CONTROL OF A CONVEYOR BELT: DESIGN AND EXPERIMENTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, (19960201), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 126 - 131, XP000559293 [X] 1-3,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 4-11,15-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/70.481757
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851210), vol. 009, no. 314, Database accession no. (P - 412), [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * [A] 3-11,14-22
 [A]  - DIRNDORFER A, "INDUSTRIEROBOTER ZUR FOERDERBANDSYNCHRONEN MONTAGE", ROBOTERSYSTEME, (19920101), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 44 - 48, XP000266177 [A] 1-22 * page 46, column L, paragraph 6 - page 47, column R, paragraph 1; figures 5,6 *