Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025086

EP1025086 - BENZAMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DORSCH, Dieter
Königsberger Strasse 17A
D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
02 / JURASZYK, Horst
Kleiner Ring 14
D-64342 Seeheim / DE
03 / WURZIGER, Hanns
Greinstrasse 7b
D-64291 Darmstadt / DE
04 / BERNOTAT-DANIELOWSKI, Sabine
Liebigstrasse 5
D-61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
05 / MELZER, Guido
Mörikestrasse 6
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
[2000/32]
Application number, filing date98948982.816.09.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998EP05898
Priority number, dateDE199714343501.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19743435
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916751
Date:08.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025086
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025086
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/81, A61K31/495, C07D271/06, C07D295/22, C07D295/20, C07D333/34, C07D215/36, C07D311/74, C07D333/38, C07D213/18, C07D261/10, C07D333/70, C07D317/68, C07D413/12
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
Extension statesLT03.02.2000
LV03.02.2000
RO03.02.2000
SI03.02.2000
TitleGerman:BENZAMIDINDERIVATE ALS FAKTOR XA-INHIBITOREN[2000/32]
English:BENZAMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS[2000/32]
French:DERIVES DE BENZAMIDINE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR Xa[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2000National basic fee paid 
03.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2003Fee for grant paid
19.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.06.2003
FR25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
IT25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
AT16.09.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
BE30.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FI25.06.2003
FR25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
AT16.09.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
BE30.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2005/11]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
AT16.09.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
BE30.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/52]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
BE30.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/44]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
CH30.09.2003
LI30.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/39]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
CY16.09.2003
LU16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/36]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
CY16.09.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/22]FI25.06.2003
GB25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/10]FI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR25.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0608759  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 9; example 1 * * page 13 - page 14; examples 5,6 *;
 [A]WO9322303  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 *;
 [A]WO9208709  (PENTAPHARM AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 94 - page 100; tables 19-26 *;
 [DA]EP0540051  (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * page 58; example 1 * * page 3, lines 1-7 *
 [A]  - ELDRED C D ET AL, "Orally Active Non-Peptide Fibrinogen Receptor (GpIIb/IIIa) Antagonists: Identification of 4-[4-[4-(Aminoimino methyl)phenyl]-1-piperazinyl]-1- piperidineacetic Acid as a Long-Acting, Broad-Spectrum Antithrombotic Agent", J. MED. CHEM. (JMCMAR,00222623);94; VOL.37 (23); PP.3882-5, Glaxo Group Research Ltd.;Department of Medicinal Chemistry; Ware / Hertfordshire; SG12 ODP; UK (GB), XP000579663 [A] 1-9 * page 3883 - page 3884; tables 1-3 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00049a006
 [A]  - STUERZEBECHER J ET AL, "Synthesis and Structure-Activity Relationships of Potent Thrombin Inhibitors: Piperazides of 3-Amidinophenylalanine", J. MED. CHEM. (JMCMAR,00222623);97; VOL.40 (19); PP.3091-3099, Zentrum fuer Vaskulaere Biologie und Medizin;Klinikum der Friedrich-Schiller-Universitaet Jena; Erfurt; D-99089; Germany (DE), XP002077904 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3093; table 2 * * page 3094; table 4 *