EP1032578 - NOVEL METHYLENEBISPHOSPHONIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIRAS OY Pansiontie 45-47 20210 Turku / FI | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHJALA, Esko Tohtorinkatu 7 B 6 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
VEPSÄLÄINEN, Jouko Mahlatie 9 A 3 FIN-70150 Kuopio / FI | 03 /
NUPPONEN, Heikki Viklankuja 6 FIN-36200 Kangasala / FI | 04 /
KÄHKÖNEN, Jouni Porrassalmenkatu 41 C FIN-50100 Mikkeli / FI | 05 /
LAUREN, Leena Linnankatu 8 D 69 FIN-20100 Turku / FI | 06 /
HANNUNIEMI, Ritva Urheilutie 16 FIN-21620 Kuusisto / FI | 07 /
JÄRVINEN, Tomi Sompatie 3 I 6 FIN-70200 Kuopio / FI | 08 /
AHLMARK, Marko Särkiniementie 18 as. 18 FIN-70700 Kuopio / FI | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Matilainen, Mirja Helena, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Matilainen, Mirja Helena, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98949022.2 | 20.10.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998FI00814 | Priority number, date | FI19970004001 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: FI 974001 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920634 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032578 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, C07F9/40, C07F9/44, A61K31/66 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C07F9/409 (EP,US);
C07F9/38 (KR);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
C07F9/4093 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Extension states | AL | 14.04.2000 | LT | 14.04.2000 | LV | 14.04.2000 | MK | 14.04.2000 | RO | 14.04.2000 | SI | 14.04.2000 | Title | German: | NEUE METHYLENBISPHOSPHONSÄURE-DERIVATE | [2000/36] | English: | NOVEL METHYLENEBISPHOSPHONIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2000/36] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES D'ACIDE METHYLENEBISPHOSPHONIQUE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9015806 (HUHTAMAEKI OY [FI]); | [A]EP0416689 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]WO9211267 (HUHTAMAEKI YHTHYMAE OY [FI]); | [A]WO9211269 (HUHTAMAEKI OY [FI]); | [A]WO9211268 (HUHTAMAEKI OY [FI]) |