EP1021319 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY CALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states RENAULT 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANIER, Emmanuel 34, rue Parmentier F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne RENAULT TECHNOCENTRE Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [2003/45] | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne Renault SAS Technocentre TCR-GRA-1-55 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/18] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Ballot, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98949041.2 | 12.10.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998FR02183 | Priority number, date | FR19970012702 | 10.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712702 | [2000/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919177 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021319 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1021319 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/10 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B60R25/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/30] | Title | German: | NOTRUFVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2000/30] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY CALL | [2000/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'APPEL D'URGENCE | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.03.2005 | ES | 27.06.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 27.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9316452 (SIMMS IND INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 6 - page 7, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR2718552 (KOLLEN PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5311197 (SORDEN JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract *; | [X]WO9724005 (DIMINO MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5335264 (NAMEKAWA MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 3 * abstract * |